Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 09:49:33 (UTC).

Hands v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Hands filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paula Xinis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01147

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paula Xinis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Hands

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Correspondence from the Clerk to Counsel regarding Transfer case. (c/m 6/8/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00045. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#3) *Amended by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16371665 filed by Tyler Hands. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correspondence from the Clerk to Counsel regarding Transfer case. (c/m 6/8/2021 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00045. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the District of Maryland via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *Amended by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-45-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16371665 filed by Tyler Hands. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant