This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2022 at 08:17:19 (UTC).

Handley-Miley v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 Handley-Miley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Greyhound Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00823

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dorothy Handley-Miley

Defendants

Greyhound Lines, Inc.

FirstGroup Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James B. Moseley

Attorney at Moseley & Moseley

237-D Castlewood Drive

Murfreesboro, TN 37129

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Gardella

Attorney at Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.

315 Deaderick Street, Suite 1550

Nashville, TN 37238

Lee L. Piovarcy

Attorney at Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.

315 Deaderick Street, Suite 1550

Nashville, TN 37238

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Attachment 1 - Davidson County Circuit Court Notice of Removal

1 #3

Attachment 2 - Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 2:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#5

(#5) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#6

(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FirstGroup Services, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#7

(#7) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#8

(#8) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FirstGroup Services, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by FirstGroup Services, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc..(Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by FirstGroup Services, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc..(Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FirstGroup Services, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#5 , #6 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the documents using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FirstGroup Services, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Gardella, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2022 at 2:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew Gardella, Lee L. Piovarcy, James B. Moseley admitted to this court. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FirstGroup Services, Inc., Greyhound Lines, Inc. from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 22C1788. (Filing fee $402, receipt number ATNMDC-3684214.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Attachment 1 - Davidson County Circuit Court Notice of Removal, #3 Attachment 2 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greyhound Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Gardella

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee L. Piovarcy