This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2022 at 08:11:46 (UTC).

Handley et al v. East Valley Golf LTD et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Handley filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against East Valley Golf LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shaun Handley

Chance McGaughey

Defendants

East Valley Golf LTD an Arizona company doing business as Revegetation Services

Kurt Anderson

Amy Anderson

Jake Anderson

Deanna Anderson

East Valley Golf Limited an Arizona company doing business as Revegetation Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Saul Barrat

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Michael David Zoldan

Attorney at Zoldan Law Group PLLC

5050 N 40Th St., Ste. 260

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Defendant Attorney

Arthur J Bourque

Attorney at Bourque Law Firm

1819 E Morten Ave., Ste. 280

Phoenix, AZ 85020

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 4/7/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/11/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf Limited. (Bourque, Arthur) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf Limited.(Bourque, Arthur) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

10 #1

Proposed Order Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon Kurt Anderson on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#8

(#8) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon Jake Anderson on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#7

(#7) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon East Valley on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#6

(#6) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon Amy Anderson on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The parties are advised, pursuant to LRCiv 12.1(c), that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. Before the filing of any motion under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c), the parties must confer in good faith to determine whether the motion can be avoided. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file notice of service with the Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/3/22. (SST) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20207809 filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 4/7/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/11/2022. (RMV) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf Limited. (Bourque, Arthur) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf Limited.(Bourque, Arthur) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including 2/11/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/8/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bourque, Arthur) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #10 Stipulation, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including 2/8/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/24/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Bourque, Arthur) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon Kurt Anderson on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon Jake Anderson on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon East Valley on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey: Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: VERIFIED COMPLAINT; CIVIL COVER SHEET; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; ORDER RE: MOTIONS upon Amy Anderson on 1/4/22. (Barrat, Jason) *Modified to correct service date on 1/6/2022. (SMH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The parties are advised, pursuant to LRCiv 12.1(c), that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. Before the filing of any motion under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c), the parties must confer in good faith to determine whether the motion can be avoided. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file notice of service with the Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/3/22. (SST) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Amy Anderson, Deanna Anderson, Jake Anderson, Kurt Anderson, East Valley Golf LTD. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20207809. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-3-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(JAM) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20207809 filed by Shaun Handley, Chance McGaughey. (Barrat, Jason) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less