This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 09:36:17 (UTC).

Hand v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Hand filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerry H. Ritter and Kirtan Khalsa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00171

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

Presiding Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melanee Hand

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andras Szantho

Attorney at Szantho Law Firm, PC

210 Montezuma Ave., Suite 200

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Defendant Attorneys

Clinton E. Dow

Attorney at Guebert Bruckner Gentile PC

6801 Jefferson Ne, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Elizabeth M. Piazza

Attorney at Guebert Bruckner PC

6801 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Terry R. Guebert

Attorney at Guebert Bruckner P.C.

P.O. Box 93880

Albuquerque, NM 87199-3880

 

Court Documents

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 6/3/2021 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 5/27/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/14/2021. (cd) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Uninsured Motorist Benefits, Declaratory Judgment, Breach of Contract, Breach of Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Insurance Bad Faith, Violations of New Mexico Insurance Code and Violations of New Mexico Unfair Practices Act by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Guebert, Terry) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Melanee Hand voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Szantho, Andras)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7562573 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dow, Clinton) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-132-CV-2020-00111. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit Exhibit C)(Dow, Clinton) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant