This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 08:51:57 (UTC).

Hand v. QCHC, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Hand filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against QCHC, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine A Crytzer and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A Crytzer

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexis C Hand

Defendants

QCHC Management Services Company, Inc. d/b/a Quality Correctional Health Care

QCHC of Tennessee, Inc. d/b/a Quality Correctional Health Care

QCHC, Inc. d/b/a Quality Correctional Health Care

QCHC Management Services Company, Inc. doing business as Quality Correctional Health Care

QCHC, Inc. doing business as Quality Correctional Health Care

QCHC of Tennessee, Inc. doing business as Quality Correctional Health Care

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Burkhalter, II

Attorney at The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.

111 S. Central Street, P O Box 2777

Knoxville, TN 37901-2777

Zachary J Burkhalter

Attorney at The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.

111 S. Central Street, P O Box 2777

Knoxville, TN 37901-2777

David Alexander Burkhalter, III

Attorney at The Burkhalter Law Firm, P.C.

111 S. Central Street, P O Box 2777

Knoxville, TN 37901-2777

Defendant Attorney

L Eric Ebbert

Attorney at The Ebbert Law Firm

9145 Cross Park Drive, Ste. 103, Knoxville

Knoxville, TN 37923

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Other Certified Mail Receipt

#8

7 #1

Other Certified Mail Receipt

#7

6 #1

Other Certified Mail Receipt

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Summons QCHC Management Services Company, Inc.

2 #1

Summons QCHC of Tennessee, Inc.

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on March 30, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent) (AYB) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by QCHC Management Services Company, Inc., QCHC of Tennessee, Inc., QCHC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent QCHC of America, Inc. for QCHC Management Services Company, Inc., QCHC of Tennessee, Inc.. (Ebbert, L) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by QCHC Management Services Company, Inc., QCHC of Tennessee, Inc., QCHC, Inc..(Ebbert, L) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis C Hand. QCHC of Tennessee, Inc. served on 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Receipt)(Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis C Hand. QCHC, Inc. served on 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Receipt)(Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexis C Hand. QCHC Management Services Company, Inc. served on 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Receipt)(Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 02/05/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 02/05/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 02/05/2021. (AMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to QCHC Management Services Company, Inc., QCHC of Tennessee, Inc., and QCHC, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons QCHC of Tennessee, Inc., #2 Summons QCHC Management Services Company, Inc.) (AMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AMP) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against QCHC Management Services Company, Inc. d/b/a Quality Correctional Health Care, QCHC of Tennessee, Inc. d/b/a Quality Correctional Health Care, QCHC, Inc. d/b/a Quality Correctional Health Care ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4645717.), filed by Alexis C Hand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons QCHC, Inc., #8 Summons QCHC of Tennessee, #9 Summons QCHC Management Services)(Burkhalter, David) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QCHC, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L Eric Ebbert