This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2020 at 07:30:27 (UTC).

Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2020 Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03096

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC

Defendants

Catherine C. Brooks

The Internal Revenue Service

United States of America

Pamela V. Stafford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.

Attorney at S. Fenn Little, Jr. P.C.

3522 Ashford Dunwoody Road

Brookhaven, GA 30319

Matthew T. Journy

Attorney at Law Offices of James Wingfield

Suite 313, 210 Park Avenue

Worcester, MA 01609

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. The Internal Revenue Service waiver mailed on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020; United States of America waiver mailed on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Little, Samuel) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/20/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Timothy Journy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10027868).. Attorney Matthew T. Journy added appearing on behalf of Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC (nmb) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew Timothy Journy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10027868).by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. (Little, Samuel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/3/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/20. (eop) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (eop) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Hancock County Land Acquisitions, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9952533) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 7/28/2020 to correct date filed (eop). (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Fenn Little, Jr.