This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2022 at 02:13:30 (UTC).

HANAFY v. HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 HANAFY filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00878

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHADY HANAFY

Defendant

HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDREW OLCESE

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

W. CHARLES SIPIO

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

ALLISON AILEEN BARKER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Rd, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15774316.), filed by SHADY HANAFY.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES SIPIO on behalf of SHADY HANAFY (SIPIO, W.) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of SHADY HANAFY (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHADY HANAFY. HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 3/8/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER

5 #2

JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of SHADY HANAFY (OLCESE, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#7

(#7) Report Of RULE 26(F) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by SHADY HANAFY. (SIPIO, W.) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCVOERY IS DUE BY 8/26/22. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 10/21/22. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/28/22. 5/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP; E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(HALBER, LORI) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN CARPENTER on behalf of HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (CARPENTER, GAVIN) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN CARPENTER on behalf of HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (CARPENTER, GAVIN) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC..(HALBER, LORI) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCVOERY IS DUE BY 8/26/22. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 10/21/22. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/28/22. 5/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP; E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 4/28/22. (JL) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report Of RULE 26(F) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by SHADY HANAFY. (SIPIO, W.) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW OLCESE on behalf of SHADY HANAFY (OLCESE, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE VIDEO CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/28/2022 12:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO SCHEDULED CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER, #2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F)(amw) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHADY HANAFY. HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 3/8/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 3/10/22 (JL) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHADY HANAFY. (JL) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of SHADY HANAFY (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES SIPIO on behalf of SHADY HANAFY (SIPIO, W.) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HILL INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15774316.), filed by SHADY HANAFY.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hill International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW R. OLCESE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer W. CHARLES SIPIO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALLISON AILEEN BARKER