This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2020 at 09:19:36 (UTC).

Hamza et al v. Hifter

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 Hamza filed an Other lawsuit against Hifter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Anderson and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01038

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Salimah Abdullah Abrahe Jibreel

Ali Abdalla Hamza

Nehma Abdalla AlMahdi Hamza

Abdelhalim Abdalla Mahdi Hamza

Defendant

Khalifa Hifter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas M. Craig

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Notice

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Extrajudicial Killing; Degrading Treatment; Crimes Against Humanity; and War Crimes against Khalifa Hifter, filed by Ali Abdalla Hamza, Salimah Abdullah Abrahe Jibreel, Nehma Abdalla AlMahdi Hamza, Abdelhalim Abdalla Mahdi Hamza.(Craig, Thomas) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Matthew David Jury. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/8/2020. (shea) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Mark Steven Zaid. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/8/2020. (shea) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Khalifa Hifter. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(shea) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Steven Zaid and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas M. Craig Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7384008. by Ali Abdalla Hamza, Salimah Abdullah Abrahe Jibreel. (Craig, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew David Jury and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas M. Craig Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7383995. by Ali Abdalla Hamza, Salimah Abdullah Abrahe Jibreel. (Craig, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons to Khalifa Hifter by Ali Abdalla Hamza, Salimah Abdullah Abrahe Jibreel. (Craig, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7383891.), filed by Ali Abdalla Hamza, Salimah Abdullah Abrahe Jibreel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Craig, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less