This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 11:31:03 (UTC).

Hampton v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Hampton filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette A. Baker and Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01340

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nannette A. Baker

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latricia Marie Hampton

St. Louis, MO 63130

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Interested Party

SSA Office of General Counsel

Kansas City, MO 64106-2898

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas P. Llewellyn

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE - St. Louis

111 S. Tenth Street, 20Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed. R. Civ. P., Defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of Plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer Defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/23/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#10

(#10) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (MCB) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS this date. (MCB) (MCB). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4.(See CMO for complete details.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 28, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 28, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Fri Oct 23 13:57:16 CDT 2020 (Tillman, Tiffani) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4 (Administrative) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed. R. Civ. P., Defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of Plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer Defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/23/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. sent to non-electronic party this date. Fri Oct 23 11:10:33 CDT 2020 (Berg, Melanie) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings (MCB) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Oct 20 16:34:23 CDT 2020 (Brown, Erica) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Latricia Marie Hampton re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/30/2020. (EAB) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Latricia Marie Hampton. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 9/29/2020, by serving Jeffrey Jensen, U.S. Attorney, answer due 11/30/2020. (MCB) Modified on 10/1/2020 (MCB). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS this date. (MCB) (MCB). (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4, 5. sent to non-electronic party this date Mon Sep 28 10:39:13 CDT 2020 (Berg, Melanie) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4.(See CMO for complete details.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 28, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on September 28, 2020. (MCB) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Sep 25 11:01:46 CDT 2020 (admin,) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Latricia Marie Hampton. (MFG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Latricia Marie Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Appeals Council Action)(MFG) Modified on 9/25/2020 (JWD). [Clerk's note: Attachment #3 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers] (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less