This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:44:32 (UTC).

Hammoud v. Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Hammoud filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00106

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamal Hammoud

New York, NY 10022

Defendant

Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Ari Englander

Attorney at Lazare Potter Giacovas & Moyle LLP

747 Third Avenue, Ste 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Robert Anthony Giacovas

Attorney at Lazare Potter & Giacovas LLP

747 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Terrance P. Flynn

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

726 Exchange Street, Ste 1000

Buffalo, NY 14534

Kimberly P. West

Attorney at Ashcroft Law Firm, LLC

200 State Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

Michael Sullivan

Attorney at Ashcroft Law Firm

1100 Main Street, Suite 2700

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Plaintiff's letter response to Defendant's Jan. 31 Pre-Motion Letter

1 #5

Certificate of Service

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Ari Englander on behalf of Jamal Hammoud..(Englander, Jacob) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #3

Local Rule 81 Index

1 #4

Corporate Disclosure Statement

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Anthony Giacovas on behalf of Jamal Hammoud..(Giacovas, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #2

Affidavit of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq.

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear; exhibits should not be filed in the same PDF as the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#14

(#14) LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Robert A. Giacovas dated February 7, 2020 re: Cover Letter for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Jamal Hammoud. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's letter response to Defendant's Jan. 31 Pre-Motion Letter).(Englander, Jacob) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#8

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#15

(#15) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter Jamal Hammoud v. SGBL, 1:20-cv-00106-AT. filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file a Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion must be filed on or before March 15, 2020. Plaintiff's Opposition will then be due on April 15, 2020, and Defendant's Reply on April 30, 2020. SO ORDERED., (Motions due by 3/15/2020., Responses due by 4/15/2020, Replies due by 4/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/12/20) (yv) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#7

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Rule 81 Index

2 #2

Declaration of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq.

#11

(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael J. Sullivan dated January 31, 2020 re: Jamal Hammoud v. SGBL, 1:20-cv-00106-AT. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban..(Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#10

(#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter Jamal Hammoud v. SGBL, 1:20-cv-00106-AT. filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file a Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion must be filed on or before March 15, 2020. Plaintiff's Opposition will then be due on April 15, 2020, and Defendant's Reply on April 30, 2020. SO ORDERED., (Motions due by 3/15/2020., Responses due by 4/15/2020, Replies due by 4/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/12/20) (yv) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Robert A. Giacovas dated February 7, 2020 re: Cover Letter for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Jamal Hammoud. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's letter response to Defendant's Jan. 31 Pre-Motion Letter).(Englander, Jacob) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Ari Englander on behalf of Jamal Hammoud..(Englander, Jacob) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Anthony Giacovas on behalf of Jamal Hammoud..(Giacovas, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael J. Sullivan dated January 31, 2020 re: Jamal Hammoud v. SGBL, 1:20-cv-00106-AT. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban..(Sullivan, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JT) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Michael J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513367. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 MOTION for Kimberly P. West to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18513979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Notice of Removal, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Terrance P. Flynn dated 01/09/2020. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban.(Flynn, Terrance) Modified on 1/21/2020 (lb). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 657264/2019..Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq., #3 Rule 81 Index, #4 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Terrance) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear; exhibits should not be filed in the same PDF as the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Terrance P. Flynn to RE-FILE Document No.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 657264/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18433552).Document filed by Societe Generale De Banque Au Liban. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Terrance P. Flynn, Esq., #3 Local Rule 81 Index, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Certificate of Service)(Flynn, Terrance) Modified on 1/7/2020 (pne). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.