This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:05:26 (UTC).

Hammoodi v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Hammoodi filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John L. Sinatra, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alshima Hammoodi

Defendants

ATTORNEY GENERAL William P. Barr

Carmen Whaling

Chad Wolf

Kenneth Cuccinelli

William P. Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert F. Graziano

Attorney at The Law Office of Robert F. Graziano

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1455

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to the Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court, on February 14, 2020.(JMM) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Carmen Whaling and Chad Wolf. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Summons Filed. (Graziano, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Original Summons Filed. (Graziano, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons Filed. (Graziano, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons Filed. (Graziano, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Attorney directed to file individual summons for each defendant. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3698190, filed by Alshima Hammoodi. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graziano, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.