This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 10:56:05 (UTC).

HAMMONDS v. ISSACS et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 HAMMONDS filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against ISSACS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Tanya Walton Pratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00641

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATHAN HAMMONDS

New Castle, IN 47362

Defendants

M. ISSACS

GEO GROUP INC.

WEXFORD HEALTH

DURBIN

JOHN NWANNUAU

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER DENYING AS UNNECESSARY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as unnecessary. Mr. Hammonds continues to have through May 24, 2021, in which to pay an initial partial filing fee of Seventeen Dollars and Eighty-Eight Cents ($17.88). See dkt. #9 . Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/6/2021 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). (LBT) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

10 #2

Envelope

10 #1

Trust Account Statement

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(LBT) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER - GRANTING RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Mr. Hammonds' renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #8 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seventeen Dollars and Eighty-Eight Cents ($17.88). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through May 24, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/26/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S Mail cc: Finance (CKM) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Trust Fund Statement), filed by Plaintiff NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JD) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JD) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#6

(#6) ENTRY - denying as presented Dkt. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mr. Hammonds shall have through May 19, 2021, to renew his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied with a copy of the relevant trust account statement. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (See Entry). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/21/2021. (AKH) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through April 19, 2021, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Outcome of Allegation

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DURBIN, GEO GROUP INC., M. ISSACS, JOHN NWANNUAU, WEXFORD HEALTH, filed by NATHAN HAMMONDS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Outcome of Allegation, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope). (AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DENYING AS UNNECESSARY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as unnecessary. Mr. Hammonds continues to have through May 24, 2021, in which to pay an initial partial filing fee of Seventeen Dollars and Eighty-Eight Cents ($17.88). See dkt. #9 . Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/6/2021 (Copy mailed to Plaintiff). (LBT) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(LBT) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - GRANTING RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; Mr. Hammonds' renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #8 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Seventeen Dollars and Eighty-Eight Cents ($17.88). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through May 24, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/26/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S Mail cc: Finance (CKM) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Trust Fund Statement), filed by Plaintiff NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JD) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JD) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY - denying as presented Dkt. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mr. Hammonds shall have through May 19, 2021, to renew his motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied with a copy of the relevant trust account statement. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (See Entry). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/21/2021. (AKH) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through April 19, 2021, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail). (JRT) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff NATHAN HAMMONDS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DURBIN, GEO GROUP INC., M. ISSACS, JOHN NWANNUAU, WEXFORD HEALTH, filed by NATHAN HAMMONDS. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Outcome of Allegation, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope). (AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Durbin is a litigant

Latest cases where WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant