This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2020 at 07:59:32 (UTC).

Hammond v. State of Illinois et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Hammond filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against State of Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03281

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shad Hammond

Dixon, IL 61021

Defendants

Trevor Chandler

Administrative Review Board

Tracy Harrisson

. Watson

Patty Shull

A.D.A. Committee Members

. Finch

. Crowder

Dept. of Corrections

Patty Sneed

Brendan Mowen

. Connelly

. Ashcraft

State of Illinois

. Snyder

. Bangert

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Shad Hammond.(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit Part 2

#3

(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint by Shad Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2)(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #5

Exhibits part 5

1 #4

Exhibits part 4

1 #3

Exhibits part 3

1 #2

Exhibits part 2

1 #1

Exhibits part 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shad Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits part 1, #2 Exhibits part 2, #3 Exhibits part 3, #4 Exhibits part 4, #5 Exhibits part 5)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #4 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $2.72. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 12/19/2019. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Shad Hammond. (RK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Shad Hammond.(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Exhibit to #1 Complaint by Shad Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2)(RK, ilcd) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 12/6/2019. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint but has not paid the $400 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Joe Billy McDade. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 12/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shad Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits part 1, #2 Exhibits part 2, #3 Exhibits part 3, #4 Exhibits part 4, #5 Exhibits part 5)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASHCRAFT COMPANY (ROE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases where . Connelly is a litigant

Latest cases where FINCH is a litigant

Latest cases where Administrative Review Board is a litigant