This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:04:45 (UTC).

HAMMOND v. 1 OPAL INC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HAMMOND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1 OPAL INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julia T. Hammond

Defendant

1 Opal, Inc. d/b/a Schooners The Last Local Beach Club

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM BANTON PRICE

Attorney at THE PRICE LAW FIRM - PANAMA CITY FL

Po Box 351

Panama City, FL 32402

TURNER ARTHUR ROUSE

Attorney at THE ROUSE LAW FIRM

Po Box 1866

Lynn Haven, FL 32444

Defendant Attorney

KATHERINE LAURA GUDAITIS

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ - MIAMI FL

1221 Brickell Ave, 19Th Fl

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by 1 OPAL, INC. d/b/a SCHOONERS THE LAST LOCAL BEACH CLUB. (GUDAITIS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER. The motion to dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is DENIED as moot, and Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. (Answer due by 1/31/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/17/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#11

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1 OPAL, INC. d/b/a SCHOONERS THE LAST LOCAL BEACH CLUB, filed by Julia T. Hammond. (ROUSE, TURNER) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/29/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 5/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/15/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by 1 OPAL, INC. d/b/a SCHOONERS THE LAST LOCAL BEACH CLUB. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/28/2020). (GUDAITIS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE PIDERMANN on behalf of All Defendants (PIDERMANN, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE LAURA GUDAITIS on behalf of All Defendants (GUDAITIS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on W. B. Sparkman, III on 12/23/2019, filed by Julia T. Hammond. (PRICE, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to 1 OPAL INC. (sdw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. If necessary, and upon proper motion, the Court will revisit the issue after Defendant is served. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/9/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Julia T. Hammond. (PRICE, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 1 Opal, Inc. d/b/a Schooners The Last Local Beach Club ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4731036.), filed by Julia T. Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (PRICE, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by 1 OPAL, INC. d/b/a SCHOONERS THE LAST LOCAL BEACH CLUB. (GUDAITIS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. The motion to dismiss (Doc. #9 ) is DENIED as moot, and Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. (Answer due by 1/31/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/17/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1 OPAL, INC. d/b/a SCHOONERS THE LAST LOCAL BEACH CLUB, filed by Julia T. Hammond. (ROUSE, TURNER) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/29/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 5/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/15/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by 1 OPAL, INC. d/b/a SCHOONERS THE LAST LOCAL BEACH CLUB. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/28/2020). (GUDAITIS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE PIDERMANN on behalf of All Defendants (PIDERMANN, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE LAURA GUDAITIS on behalf of All Defendants (GUDAITIS, KATHERINE) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on W. B. Sparkman, III on 12/23/2019, filed by Julia T. Hammond. (PRICE, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. Aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to 1 OPAL INC. (sdw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. If necessary, and upon proper motion, the Court will revisit the issue after Defendant is served. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/9/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Julia T. Hammond. (PRICE, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 1 Opal, Inc. d/b/a Schooners The Last Local Beach Club ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4731036.), filed by Julia T. Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (PRICE, WILLIAM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less