This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 08:10:24 (UTC).

Hammond Surgical Hospital, L.L.C. v. CNA Insurance Company et al.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 Hammond Surgical Hospital, L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CNA Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03473

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hammond Surgical Hospital, L.L.C. doing business as Cypress Pointe Surgical Hospital

Defendants

American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania

CNA Insurance Company

American Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle Mayne Davis

Jack Etherton Truitt

Kaylin Kinley Storey

Lauren Anne Duncan

Defendant Attorney

Catherine N. Thigpen

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Affidavit Declaration of David B. Lehman

1 #2

Exhibit Petition and Service Papers

1 #3

Exhibit Policy

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 08/26/2022.(cs) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#5

(#5) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (cs) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#6

(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Thigpen, Catherine) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Lehman)(Thigpen, Catherine) Modified link/text on 10/3/2022 (pp). (Entered: 09/30/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit Declaration of David Lehman

#9

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay /Abate Proceedings by Hammond Surgical Hospital, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Truitt, Jack) Modified text on 10/7/2022 (pp). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Monday, December 19, 2022, the parties shall file a motion to reopen plaintiff's claims against defendant. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/7/2022. (pp) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than Monday, December 19, 2022, the parties shall file a motion to reopen plaintiff's claims against defendant. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/7/2022. (pp) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay /Abate Proceedings by Hammond Surgical Hospital, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Truitt, Jack) Modified text on 10/7/2022 (pp). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Answer to Complaint.** Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document 7 to document 1. No further action necessary.** (pp) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Lehman)(Thigpen, Catherine) Modified link/text on 10/3/2022 (pp). (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania (Thigpen, Catherine) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (cs) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 08/26/2022.(cs) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (cs) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 20220002433 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9570115) filed by American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David B. Lehman, #2 Exhibit-State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Catherine N. Thigpen added to party American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania(pty:dft).(Thigpen, Catherine) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/26/2022) (cs). Modified image/text on 9/26/2022 (cs). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less