This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2019 at 07:39:21 (UTC).

Hammock v. Berman & Rabin, P.A. et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Hammock filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Berman Rabin, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Simpson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00633

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Simpson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mia J. Hammock

Defendants

Hunter Warfield, Inc.

Pioneer Asset Trust

MidCountry Bank, FSB

Berman & Rabin, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James H. Lawson

Attorney at Lawson at Law, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

Defendant Attorney

Robert B. Craig

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister, LLP - Covington

1717 Dixie Highway, Suite 910

Covington, KY 41011-4704

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MidCountry Bank, FSB. (Craig, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MidCountry Bank, FSB. (Craig, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT PIONEER ASSET TRUST WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 10/18/2019, re #5 - Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Pioneer Asset Trust in this case are DISMISSED without prejudice. This dismissal does not affect Plaintiff's claims against any other Defendant in this matter. (KD) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Craig on behalf of MidCountry Bank, FSB (Craig, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mia J. Hammock (Lawson, James) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mia J. Hammock. Hunter Warfield, Inc. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Lawson, James) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Berman & Rabin, P.A., Hunter Warfield, Inc., MidCountry Bank, FSB, and Pioneer Asset Trust. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Berman & Rabin, P.A., Hunter Warfield, Inc., MidCountry Bank, FSB, and Pioneer Asset Trust. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2938149, filed by Mia J. Hammock. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MidCountry Bank, FSB. (Craig, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MidCountry Bank, FSB. (Craig, Robert) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT PIONEER ASSET TRUST WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 10/18/2019, re #5 - Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Pioneer Asset Trust in this case are DISMISSED without prejudice. This dismissal does not affect Plaintiff's claims against any other Defendant in this matter. (KD) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Craig on behalf of MidCountry Bank, FSB (Craig, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mia J. Hammock (Lawson, James) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mia J. Hammock. Hunter Warfield, Inc. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Lawson, James) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Berman & Rabin, P.A., Hunter Warfield, Inc., MidCountry Bank, FSB, and Pioneer Asset Trust. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Berman & Rabin, P.A., Hunter Warfield, Inc., MidCountry Bank, FSB, and Pioneer Asset Trust. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2938149, filed by Mia J. Hammock. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Berman & Rabin, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDCOUNTRY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Hunter Warfield, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert B. Craig