This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2020 at 09:49:27 (UTC).

Hamlin et al v. Katerra Incorporated

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Hamlin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Katerra Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05886

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Hanks

Susan Hamlin

Defendant

Katerra Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel James Hill

Attorney at Jackson White PC

40 N Center St., Ste. 200

Mesa, AZ 85201

Michael Rhodes Pruitt

Attorney at Jackson White PC

40 N Center St., Ste. 200

Mesa, AZ 85201

Grant Simeon Cragun

Attorney at Jackson White PC

40 N Center St., Ste. 200

Mesa, AZ 85201

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Shawn Oller

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Kimberly Marie Shappley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/13/20. (GMP) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Katerra Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#13

(#13) Defendant Katerra Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Katerra Incorporated.(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/12/20 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/28/20. (DXD) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge; Notice Re MIDP, Order/Notice upon Katerra, Inc. on January 8, 2020. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Katerra Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Submitted by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 3/23/20. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/27/19. (DXD) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17770126. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5886-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

1 #2

Consent to Join

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17770126 filed by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Join)(KEP) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/13/20. (GMP) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Katerra Incorporated. (Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant Katerra Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Katerra Incorporated.(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 2/12/20 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/28/20. (DXD) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Katerra Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shappley, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge; Notice Re MIDP, Order/Notice upon Katerra, Inc. on January 8, 2020. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Katerra Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Submitted by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Summons Submitted filed by Paul Hanks, Susan Hamlin.Summons submitted blank without the name of the defendant, and attorney contact information section left blank. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (HLA) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER - The Clerk shall terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 3/23/20. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/27/19. (DXD) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17770126. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5886-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17770126 filed by Susan Hamlin, Paul Hanks. (Pruitt, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Join)(KEP) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Marie Shappley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Shawn Oller