This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:14:49 (UTC).

Hamilton v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Hamilton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry T. Wingate and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helen Hamilton

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

John Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles C. Cole

Attorney at REVCLAIMS, LLC

277 East Pearl Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Charles Cassidy Cole

Attorney at TONEY BALDWIN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

P. O. Box 3199, 4680 Mcwillie Drive (39206)

Jackson, MS 39207

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131)

300 Concourse Blvd., SUIT 200

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131)

300 Concourse Blvd., SUIT 200

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#10

(#10) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) Modified on 8/16/2021 (KNS). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#9

(#9) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Production by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#8

(#8) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Admissions by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#7

(#7) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#6

(#6) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Production by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#5

(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Admissions by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION and RESETTING HEARING: The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for August 26, 2021 is being cancelled due to a court conflict and for good cause. The TCMC is being reset for 9/10/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : This document appears to be a duplicate filing. Therefore, Doc. #10 should be disregarded. (KNS) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) Modified on 8/16/2021 (KNS). (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Production by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Admissions by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : This document notices service of multiple forms of discovery. Each event should be separately docketed. The same PDF document may be used for all entries. Attorney is advised to docket additional events as needed. These events are found in the electronic docketing system under Discovery Documents. (KNS) (Entered: 08/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Production by Helen Hamilton (Cole, Charles) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012(Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP from Circuit Court of Madison County, Mississippi, case number 21-79. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4603307) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Caroline Johnson