This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 08:35:02 (UTC).

Hamilton v. Stone

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Hamilton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Stone. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dudley H. Bowen and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dudley H. Bowen

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jeffrey Earl Hamilton

Mcrae Helena, GA 31055

Respondent

Warden Stacey N. Stone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Jason W. Blanchard

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Augusta

P.O. Box 2017

Augusta, GA 30903

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

USM 285 (3)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Signature Page re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Jeffrey Earl Hamilton. (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#5

(#5) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Stacey N. Stone on 10/7/21, signed by R. Brown, and Civil Process Clerk at the Office of the U.S. Attorney on 10/8/21, signed by Nayne Phillips. (ca) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#6

(#6) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to US Attorney General on 10/12/2021; USMS Service Remark: Certificate of Service signed by E. Sase on 10/12/2021. (jlh) Modified on 10/26/2021 (thb). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kneyse Martin w attchs

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot. (thb) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by Stacey N. Stone. Responses due by 11/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kneyse Martin w attchs)(Blanchard, Jason) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to US Attorney General on 10/12/2021; USMS Service Remark: Certificate of Service signed by E. Sase on 10/12/2021. (jlh) Modified on 10/26/2021 (thb). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketSet Deadline: Stacey N. Stone answer due 10/28/2021. (ca) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Stacey N. Stone on 10/7/21, signed by R. Brown, and Civil Process Clerk at the Office of the U.S. Attorney on 10/8/21, signed by Nayne Phillips. (ca) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Signature Page re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Jeffrey Earl Hamilton. (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/03/2021. (maa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2021: #1 USM 285 (3)) (maa). (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/17/2021. (thb) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $5.00, receipt number AUG029808. (ca) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jeffrey Earl Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ca) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason W. Blanchard