This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2022 at 06:38:18 (UTC).

Hamilton v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Hamilton filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00733

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denise Hamilton

Defendant

Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Robert Owens, Jr

Attorney at Robert Owens, Attorney

Po Box 1157

Walhalla, SC 29691

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Harrington Austin

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Chas)

Po Box 486

Charleston, SC 29401

Mark W Bakker

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Gville)

Po Box 10648

Greenville, SC 29603

Matthew Gerald Sheridan

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Travis James Sales

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/26/22. (arut) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

42 #1

Proposed Order Order

42 #42

Main Document

41 #2

Exhibit Governing Plan Document

41 #1

Exhibit Administrative Record

41 #41

Main Document

#38

(#38) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. Response to Motion due by 6/23/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bakker, Mark) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denise Hamilton (Owens, William) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#35

(#35) ANSWER to Complaint by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan.(Austin, Alexandra) (Main Document 35 replaced on 6/1/2022 with corrected document provided by filing user) (arut). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

11 #11

Main Document

9 #1

State Court Documents Acknowledgment and Receipt of Notice of Removal

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan.(Austin, Alexandra) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/14/2022: to replace with corrected document (case number) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

3 #3

Main Document

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

State Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/26/22. (arut) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #42 Motion for Extension of Time for mediation. The mediation deadline is extended until October 31, 2022. The parties are directed to notify the court of the results of their mediation no later than 24 hours after completion. Memoranda in support of judgment are due November 21, 2022. The parties' motion to excuse the Plan and the Plaintiff from attending mediation in person is denied. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/2/22. (sfla) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan, Denise Hamilton. Response to Motion due by 8/15/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Austin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/2/2022 to add joint filer as listed. (arut). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) JOINT STIPULATION by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan, Denise Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit Governing Plan Document)(Austin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/2/2022 to add joint filer as listed (arut). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion to Substitute Attorney Mark W. Bakker in place of James T. Hedgepath. Added attorney Mark W Bakker for Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/9/22.(sfla) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. Response to Motion due by 6/23/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bakker, Mark) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denise Hamilton (Owens, William) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to Complaint by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan.(Austin, Alexandra) (Main Document 35 replaced on 6/1/2022 with corrected document provided by filing user) (arut). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/17/22. (arut) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Stipulation Deadline 8/10/2022. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/17/22. (arut) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Schlumberger Corporation. Response to Motion due by 4/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answers to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal Notice, #3 Exhibit Letter of Service)No proposed order.(Austin, Alexandra) Modified on 3/29/2022: to correct filer as listed (kmca). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #13 and #14 Letter Extending Time. Reason: re-filed by attorney to correct event and pleading. Corrected Filing Document Number #18 Consent Motion. Modified filing date to that of original filing: 3/28/22. Response due date modified to that of original filing: 4/11/22. (kmca) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Denise Hamilton. Response to Motion due by 4/11/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Letter dated 3/28/22)No proposed order.(Owens, William) Modified on 3/29/2022: to correct date filed and response due date (kmca). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Denise Hamilton.(Owens, William) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan, #2 Exhibit Letter to Denise Hamilton)No proposed order.(Austin, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed. Acknowledgement filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Acknowledgment and Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Austin, Alexandra) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/14/2022: to replace with corrected document (signed certificate of service) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan.(Austin, Alexandra) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/14/2022: to replace with corrected document (case number) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due fourteen (14) days after removal. (kmca) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kmca) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/14/2022: to replace with corrected document (case number) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-37-00785. (Filing fee $402 receipt number CSCDC-10375089), filed by Schlumberger Technology Corporation Pension Plan. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Certificate of Service)(kmca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/14/2022: to replace with corrected document (case number) as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less