This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:29:09 (UTC).

Hamilton-Bynum v. T-Mobile USA Inc

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Hamilton-Bynum filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01190

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheila Hamilton-Bynum

Defendants

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anne-Marie E Sargent

Attorney at CONNOR & SARGENT PLLC

921 Hildebrand Lane Ne Ste 240

Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

Brian C Gudmundson

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN REED LLP (MN)

1100 Ids Center80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gary F Lynch

Attorney at LYNCH CARPENTER LLP (PA)

1133 Penn Ave 5Te Fl

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Joseph P Guglielmo

Attorney at SCOTT + SCOTT LLP (NY)

The Helmsley Building230 Park Ave

New York, NY 10169

MaryBeth V. Gibson

Attorney at THE FINLEY FIRM PC

3535 Piedmont Rd Bldg 14 Ste 230

Atlanta, GA 30305

Michael J Laird

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN REED LLP (MN)

1100 Ids Center80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Nicholas A Colella

Attorney at LYNCH CARPENTER LLP (PA)

1133 Penn Ave 5Te Fl

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Rachel Kristine Tack

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN REED LLP (MN)

1100 Ids Center80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Derik Ramon Campos

Attorney at CONNOR & SARGENT PLLC

921 Hildebrand Lane Ne Ste 240

Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

Stephen P Connor

Attorney at CONNOR & SARGENT PLLC

921 Hildebrand Lane Ne Ste 240

Bainbridge Island, WA 98110

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree Stone Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#14

No Description Available

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name ; filed by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#23

(#23) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel K. Tack FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279957 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#22

(#22) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Laird FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279953 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#21

(#21) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian C. Gudmundson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279951 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#20

(#20) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MaryBeth V. Gibson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7275487 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#17

(#19) ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas A Colella for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

8 #1

List of Related Cases

8 #8

Main Document

#6

(#7) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph P Guglielmo for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name ; filed by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Lynch, Gary) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER re #20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney MaryBeth V. Gibson for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rachel Kristine Tack for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael J Laird for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian C Gudmundson for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rachel K. Tack FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279957 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael J. Laird FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279953 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian C. Gudmundson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7279951 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MaryBeth V. Gibson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7275487 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas A Colella for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-01118 2:21-cv-01119 2:21-cv-01130 2:21-cv-01137 2:21-cv-01138 2:21-cv-01139 2:21-cv-01148 2:21-cv-01153 2:21-cv-01157 2:21-cv-01161 2:21-cv-01169 2:21-cv-01179 2:21-cv-01181 2:21-cv-01183 2:21-cv-01189 2:21-cv-01208 2:21-cv-01226 2:21-cv-01245 2:21-cv-01250 2:21-cv-01266, by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Attachments: #1 List of Related Cases)(Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph P Guglielmo for plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph P. Guglielmo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7258828 (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA Inc on 9/8/2021, filed by Plaintiff Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) T-Mobile USA Inc (SG) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7232473) Attorney Anne-Marie E Sargent added to party Sheila Hamilton-Bynum(pty:pla), filed by Sheila Hamilton-Bynum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sargent, Anne-Marie) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Jeffers Tsuji