This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:13:25 (UTC).

Hamideh et al v. Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Hamideh filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02229

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ali Hamideh

Ibraahim Saab

Waleed Hamideh

Amr Hamideh

Defendant

Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saira P. Malik

Attorney at Malik Law LLC

4450 Arapahoe Avenue, Suite 100

Boulder, CO 80303

Defendant Attorneys

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Justin Hans Zouski

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone for Scheduling Conference by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#13

(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Ali Hamideh, Amr Hamideh, Waleed Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab. (Malik, Saira) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saira P. Malik on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Ali Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Amr Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Waleed Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Ibraahim Saab(pty:pla) (Malik, Saira) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

8 #2

Attachment 2

8 #1

Attachment 1

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kurt Hans Henkel on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Kurt Hans Henkel added to party Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Service of Process Transmittal of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint upon The Corporation Company on 7/7/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Ali Hamideh, Amr Hamideh, Waleed Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - Amr Hamideh Demand Letter

1 #5

Exhibit E - Waleed Hamideh Demand Letter

1 #4

Exhibit D - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31073. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7408800), filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Waleed Hamideh Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Amr Hamideh Demand Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER denying as moot [#15] Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone for Scheduling Conference in light of the Minute Order [#14] ordering the parties to appear by telephone. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on September 25, 2020. Text Only Entry(klmlc1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone for Scheduling Conference by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, ALL COUNSEL OR PARTIES who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference set October 1, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE. Participating counsel or parties shall call the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on September 24, 2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Ali Hamideh, Amr Hamideh, Waleed Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab. (Malik, Saira) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #11 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saira P. Malik on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Ali Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Amr Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Waleed Hamideh(pty:pla), Attorney Saira P. Malik added to party Ibraahim Saab(pty:pla) (Malik, Saira) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kurt Hans Henkel on behalf of Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Kurt Hans Henkel added to party Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Service of Process Transmittal of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint upon The Corporation Company on 7/7/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Ali Hamideh, Amr Hamideh, Waleed Hamideh, Ibraahim Saab.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31073. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7408800), filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Waleed Hamideh Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Amr Hamideh Demand Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zouski, Justin) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less