This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2020 at 08:28:54 (UTC).

Hamid Kheradyer v. TRPHS, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Hamid Kheradyer filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TRPHS, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09701

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hamid Kheradyer

Defendants

TRPHS, Inc.

Ray Robinson

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Does 1 to 10 Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 705

Long Beach, CA 90802

Linda Tracey Hollenbeck

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

444 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 705

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Mail Returned addressed to Ray Robinson re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 . (smo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Mail Returned addressed to Ray Robinson re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 (smo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica, CA 90401. Case No. 19SMUD01552. (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica, CA 90401. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Reason: Other: The removed California unlawful detainer action should be remanded sua sponte. See 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c)(Court "shall" remand "any time" it appears to lack subject matter jurisdiction over case). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Ray Robinson. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ray Robinson. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for County of Los Angeles, Santa Monica Courthouse, case number 19SMUD01552 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by Defendant Ray Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Mail Returned addressed to Ray Robinson re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 . (smo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail Returned addressed to Ray Robinson re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 (smo) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica, CA 90401. Case No. 19SMUD01552. (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Santa Monica, CA 90401. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Reason: Other: The removed California unlawful detainer action should be remanded sua sponte. See 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c)(Court "shall" remand "any time" it appears to lack subject matter jurisdiction over case). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (bm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(klg) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Ray Robinson. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ray Robinson. (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for County of Los Angeles, Santa Monica Courthouse, case number 19SMUD01552 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by Defendant Ray Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tania Kim Cardoso