This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:44:58 (UTC).

Hamdan v. Mukunda et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Hamdan filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Mukunda. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00493

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wasseem Hamdan

Defendants

India Globalization Capital, Inc.

Richard Prins

Claudia Grimaldi

Sudhakar Shenoy

Ram Mukunda

Rohit Goel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Joseph Minton

Attorney at Goldman and Minton PC

3600 Clipper Mill Rd, Suite 201

Baltimore, MD 21211

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Edward Feinberg

Attorney at PilieroMazza, PLLC

888 17Th Street, N.W., 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Sudhakar Shenoy waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Feinberg on behalf of Rohit Goel, Claudia Grimaldi, Ram Mukunda, Richard Prins (Feinberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. India Globalization Capital, Inc. waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Ram Mukunda waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Richard Prins waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Claudia Grimaldi waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Rohit Goel waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

2 #1

Summons

2 #4

Summons

2 #5

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Rohit Goel, Claudia Grimaldi, India Globalization Capital, Inc., Ram Mukunda, Richard Prins and Sudhakar Shenoy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848823.), filed by Wasseem Hamdan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of shareholder, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (Mukunda), #4 Summons (Grimaldi), #5 Summons (Goel), #6 Summons (Prins), #7 Summons (Shenoy), #8 Summons (IGC))(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Affidavit Verification of shareholder

1 #3

Summons (Mukunda)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Sudhakar Shenoy waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Feinberg on behalf of Rohit Goel, Claudia Grimaldi, Ram Mukunda, Richard Prins (Feinberg, Matthew) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. India Globalization Capital, Inc. waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Ram Mukunda waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Richard Prins waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Claudia Grimaldi waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wasseem Hamdan. Rohit Goel waiver sent on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019.(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 2/21/2019. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Rohit Goel, Claudia Grimaldi, India Globalization Capital, Inc., Ram Mukunda, Richard Prins and Sudhakar Shenoy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7848823.), filed by Wasseem Hamdan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of shareholder, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (Mukunda), #4 Summons (Grimaldi), #5 Summons (Goel), #6 Summons (Prins), #7 Summons (Shenoy), #8 Summons (IGC))(Minton, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.