This case was last updated from PACER on 05/19/2020 at 10:05:27 (UTC).

Hambrick et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 Hambrick filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and Catherine M. Salinas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01243

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michele Ann Hambrick

Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr.

Defendants

Credit First, National Association

Trans Union LLC

M&T Bank Corporation

Equifax Information Services, LLC

TD Bank, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack

Attorney at Berry & Associates

2751 Buford Highway Ne, Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30324

Adam Klein

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Albert Ericksen

Attorney at Dermer Appel Ruder, LLC -PT Ga

Suite 210, 6075 The Corners Parkway

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Ellen B. Silverman

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP-MN

13Th Floor, 800 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022-7688

Stephen Dermer

Attorney at Dermer Appel Ruder, LLC -PT Ga

Suite 210, 6075 The Corners Parkway

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Electronic Summons Issued as to M&T Bank Corporation. (dob) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#16

(#16) Electronic Summons Issued as to Credit First, National Association. (dob) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#15

(#15) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michele Ann Hambrick, Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr Credit First, National Association, et al. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#14

(#14) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michele Ann Hambrick, Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr M&T Bank Corporation, et al. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#13

(#13) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons by TD Bank, National Association. (Dermer, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. Trans Union LLC waiver mailed on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. TD Bank, National Association waiver mailed on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#3

Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#2

(#2) GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr. and Michele Ann Hambrick. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9497793) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/25/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Electronic Summons Issued as to M&T Bank Corporation. (dob) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Electronic Summons Issued as to Credit First, National Association. (dob) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michele Ann Hambrick, Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr Credit First, National Association, et al. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Michele Ann Hambrick, Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr M&T Bank Corporation, et al. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER GRANTING #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ellen Beth Silverman by CRD at the direction of the Court. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on April 29, 2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lwb) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Ellen Beth Silverman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9626137).. Attorney Ellen B. Silverman added appearing on behalf of TD Bank, National Association (cdg) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION for Admission of Ellen Beth Silverman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9626137).by TD Bank, National Association. (Dermer, Stephen) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #11 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons by TD Bank, National Association. (Dermer, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver mailed on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. Trans Union LLC waiver mailed on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr, Michele Ann Hambrick. TD Bank, National Association waiver mailed on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons by Michele Ann Hambrick, Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Wayne Hambrick, Sr. and Michele Ann Hambrick. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9497793) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&T BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant