This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:46:51

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Intellectual Property - Trademark case was filed by Hamann GmbH against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03332
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Trademark
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Charles P. Kocoras
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff HAMANN GmbH
  • Represented By
    • Yanling Jiang
    • Keith A. Vogt
    • Yi Bu

Court Documents

#28

(#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable ...

Fees Apply
#27

(#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: ...

Fees Apply
#26

(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt,...

Fees Apply
25 #1

Declaration of Service

Fees Apply
#25

(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hamann GmbH as to All Def...

Fees Apply
#24

(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: ...

Fees Apply
#23

(#23) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of m...

Fees Apply
22 #2

Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt

Fees Apply
22 #1

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

Fees Apply
#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM by Hamann GmbH in support of motion for pre...

Fees Apply
#21

(#21) MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for preliminary injunc...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • (#28) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/9/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#27) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #21 is granted. Status hearing is set for 8/6/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
  • 06/29/2019
  • (#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/29/2019)
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hamann GmbH as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: On Court's own motion, motion hearing set for 7/2/2019 is reset to 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#23) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #21 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM by Hamann GmbH in support of motion for preliminary injunction #21 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#21) MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Plaintiff's motion to extend the Temporary Restraining order through and until 7/2/2019 #18 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/18/2019 is reset to 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM. Motion hearing set for 6/18/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#19) NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#18) MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for extension of time (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#17) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Hamann GmbH. (DOCUMENT NOT IMAGED) (jh, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
  • 06/04/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A." (ew, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#16) SEALED Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/4/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
  • 06/04/2019
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #9 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #10 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the defendant domain named, a temporary asst restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication 11 is granted. Status hearing is set for 6/18/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#14) Notice of Motion for presentment of #9 #10 11 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file #9 , motion for leave to file excess pages #10 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#13) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH Sealed Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Christian Zierhut regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 11 EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Christian Zierhut, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of CZierhut)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Hamann GmbH for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.