This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:08:45 (UTC).

HAMAL v. U.S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Immigration - Other Immigration case was filed by HAMAL against U S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02534

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIRENDRA BAHADUR HAMAL

Defendants

U.S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

USCIS NEBRASKA SERVICE CENTER

U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

KEN CUCCINELLI

KEVIN MCALEENAN

WILLIAM P. BARR

KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the plaintiff, BIRENDRA BAHADUR HAMAL, and counsel for the defendants, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Ken Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USCIS Nebraska Service Center, and U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/19/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report on or before October 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 7, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03644. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TRANSFER ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for the plaintiff, BIRENDRA BAHADUR HAMAL, and counsel for the defendants, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kevin McAleenan, Ken Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, USCIS Nebraska Service Center, and U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr, that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 8/19/2019. (Tavarez, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION to Change Venue / Stipulation to Transfer Venue for the Court's Endorsement by William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Nebraska Service Center. (Weinberg, Alex) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Scott Weinberg on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Weinberg, Alex) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Nebraska Service Center, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653141081 (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Nebraska Service Center, filed by Birendra Bahadur Hamal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.