This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 08:54:15 (UTC).

Halpin v. Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Halpin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee P. Rudofsky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee P. Rudofsky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy Halpin

Defendant

Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr.

Attorney at Attorney at Law

One Financial Center - Suite 411, 5224 Lee Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72205

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm PLLC

One Financial Center - Suite 411, 650 South Shackleford

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Joy Andrews

Attorney at Roberts Law Firm, P.A.

Post Office Box 241790

Little Rock, AR 72223-1790

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wendy Halpin (Odom, Conrad) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/17/2020 and Jury Trial set for 11/29/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/2020. (hml) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Andrews, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union.(Andrews, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/31/2020. (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union filed by Wendy Halpin. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT078298.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr. terminated. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 9/22/2020. (hml) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wendy Halpin (Odom, Conrad) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/17/2020 and Jury Trial set for 11/29/2021 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock, Arkansas Courtroom #2A before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/2020. (hml) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union (Andrews, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union.(Andrews, Amanda) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #2 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. (jak) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/31/2020. (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union and returned to counsel for service. (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union filed by Wendy Halpin. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT078298.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcoa Community Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conrad Thomas Odom, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Sanford