This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2020 at 08:10:19 (UTC).

Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company v. The Continental Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Continental Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02046

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

The Continental Insurance Company

National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Campbell Morison

Attorney at Morison & Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo, Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Henry Ming-Cheng Su

Attorney at Morison & Prough, LLP

2540 Camino Diablo, Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant Attorney

Edward James Tafe

Attorney at CNA Coverage Litigation Group

555 12Th Street, Suite 600

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss), filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

17 #1

Declaration REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURAN

#17

(#17) HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO #14 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Morison, William) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#16

(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#15

(#15) Request for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byNational Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/6/2020. Replies due by 5/13/2020. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#12

(#12) Proposed Summons. (Morison, William) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) INDEMNIFICATION (2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT (with jury demand) against The Continental Insurance Company and National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morison, William) (Filed on 4/6/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, Corporate Parent Hallmark Financial Services, Inc. for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#9

(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to The Continental Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case.. Signed by the Clerk on 03/25/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company.. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss), filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO #14 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Morison, William) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certificate of Interested Entities by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Request for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byNational Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/6/2020. Replies due by 5/13/2020. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Summons. (Morison, William) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) INDEMNIFICATION (2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT (with jury demand) against The Continental Insurance Company and National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morison, William) (Filed on 4/6/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, Corporate Parent Hallmark Financial Services, Inc. for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to The Continental Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case.. Signed by the Clerk on 03/25/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company.. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/7/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against The Continental Insurance Company. $400.00 filing fee paid, Receipt No. 0971-14309545. Filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less