This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2021 at 08:50:48 (UTC).

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. La Segunda Realty Corp et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against La Segunda Realty Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Raag Singhal and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61980

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

La Segunda Realty Corp.

Leshone Patrice Wilkerson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Antonio DeJesus Morin

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Three Brickell City Centre, 98 Southeast 7Th Street

Miami, FL 33131

Gideon Reitblat

Attorney at Akerman Senterfitt

1 Se 3Rd Avenue, 25Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-1714

Defendant Attorneys

Ricardo Alberto Reyes

Attorney at Tobin & Reyes PA

225 N. E. Mizner Blvd., Suite 510

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Michael Lewis Beckman

Attorney at Viles & Beckman LLC

6350 Presidential Court, Suite A

Fort Myers, FL 33919

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by La Segunda Realty Corp.. Attorney Ricardo Alberto Reyes added to party La Segunda Realty Corp.(pty:dft). (Reyes, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 7/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2021., Discovery due by 4/7/2022., Expert Discovery due by 4/7/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2021., Mediation Deadline 4/14/2022., In Limine Motions due by 6/17/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2022., Motions due by 4/22/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/19/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. for HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Leshone Patrice Wilkerson. (Beckman, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Leshone Patrice Wilkerson served on 10/4/2021, response/answer due 10/25/2021. (Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. La Segunda Realty Corp. served on 10/16/2021, response/answer due 11/8/2021. (Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Leshone Patrice Wilkerson. Attorney Michael Lewis Beckman added to party Leshone Patrice Wilkerson(pty:dft). (Beckman, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#3

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Summon(s) Wilkerson

1 #2

Summon(s) La Segunda Realty

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document La Segunda Realty Corp. Response/Answer due 11/23/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/4/2021. (pb00) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by La Segunda Realty Corp.. Attorney Ricardo Alberto Reyes added to party La Segunda Realty Corp.(pty:dft). (Reyes, Ricardo) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 7/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2021., Discovery due by 4/7/2022., Expert Discovery due by 4/7/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2021., Mediation Deadline 4/14/2022., In Limine Motions due by 6/17/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2022., Motions due by 4/22/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/19/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent HALLMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. for HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Leshone Patrice Wilkerson. (Beckman, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Leshone Patrice Wilkerson served on 10/4/2021, response/answer due 10/25/2021. (Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. La Segunda Realty Corp. served on 10/16/2021, response/answer due 11/8/2021. (Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Leshone Patrice Wilkerson. Attorney Michael Lewis Beckman added to party Leshone Patrice Wilkerson(pty:dft). (Beckman, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/22/2021. (jhy) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to La Segunda Realty Corp. and Leshone Patrice Wilkerson (jbs) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15029485, filed by HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) La Segunda Realty, #3 Summon(s) Wilkerson, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(Reitblat, Gideon) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo Alberto Reyes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Lewis Beckman