This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2020 at 08:10:45 (UTC).

Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Praetorian Insurance Company, et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Praetorian Insurance Company,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and George H. Wu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-MC-00083

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Praetorian Insurance Company

Respondent

Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

William C Morison

Attorney at Morison and Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Henry M Su

Attorney at Morison and Prough LLP

2540 Camino Diablo

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Respondent Attorneys

Joel Lawrence Halverson

Attorney at Severson and Werson PC

One Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

David C Hungerford

Attorney at Severson and Werson APC

One Embarcadero Center Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Stipulation

1 #2

Declaration Henry Su

1 #3

Declaration David Hungerford

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE filed by Plaintiff/Movant Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA (Morison, William) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Non-Party Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP, (Hungerford, David) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Amended filed by Movant/Plaintiff Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA (Morison, William) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by movant Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, identifying HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Morison, William) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF HEARING on Notice of Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 is set for hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 9/25/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (esa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-27781175 - Fee: $47, filed by plaintiff/movant Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation, #2 Declaration Henry Su, #3 Declaration David Hungerford) (Attorney William C Morison added to party Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company (pty:bkmov))(Morison, William) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAIGHT BROWN & BONSTEEL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Hungerford