This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 02:22:28 (UTC).

Hallinan et al v. Scarantino et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Hallinan filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Scarantino. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00563

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George Riddick

Josean Kinard

Terrance Freeman

Quamain Jackson

William Brown

Anthony Butler

Charles Hallinan

Lasalle Waldrip

Jorge Luis Maldonado

Daryl Williams

Defendants

Jeffrey Allen

Warden Thomas Scarantino

Michael Carvajal

Federal Bureau of Prisons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey S. Wilkerson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

300 S. Tryon Street, 16Th Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-0178

Maria V. Morris

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union, National Prison Project

915 15Th St. Nw, 7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - June 3, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 we

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Response in Opposition Regarding Emergency Motion for Temporary Rest

1 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey S. Wilkerson

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division Prisoner Civil Rights case. The Honorable Richard E. Myers II United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:20-CT-3333-M. No further filing shall be made in 5:20-CV-563-M. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/28/2020. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Maria V. Morris on behalf of William Brown, Anthony Butler, Terrance Freeman, Charles Hallinan, Quamain Jackson, Josean Kinard, Jorge Luis Maldonado, George Riddick, Lasalle Waldrip, Daryl Williams. (Morris, Maria) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Financial Disclosure Statement by Quamain Jackson (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Financial Disclosure Statement by Daryl Williams (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Lasalle Waldrip (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Allen, Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Thomas Scarantino. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Related Case filed by William Brown, Anthony Butler, Terrance Freeman, Charles Hallinan, Quamain Jackson, Josean Kinard, Jorge Luis Maldonado, George Riddick, Lasalle Waldrip, Daryl Williams . (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Quamain Jackson, Lasalle Waldrip, Daryl Williams. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by Anthony Butler (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Terrance Freeman (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by William Brown (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jorge Luis Maldonado (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by George Riddick (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Josean Kinard (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by Charles Hallinan (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey S. Wilkerson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5691596.), filed by William Brown, Lasalle Waldrip, George Riddick, Terrance Freeman, Daryl Williams, Josean Kinard, Anthony Butler, Charles Hallinan, Quamain Jackson, Jorge Luis Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Wilkerson, #2 Exhibit 1 - Response in Opposition Regarding Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Writ of Habeas Corpus, Hallinan v. Scarantino, No. 5:20-HC-2088-FL, #3 Exhibit 2 - June 3, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #4 Exhibit 3 - June 10, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #5 Exhibit 4 - July 6, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #6 Exhibit 5 - Federal Bureau of Prisons Press Releases on Inmate Deaths at FCC Butner, #7 Exhibit 6 - How Coronavirus Spreads, #8 Exhibit 7 - Assessing Risk Factors, #9 Exhibit 8 - Zhao Article, #10 Exhibit 9 - Age, Sex, Existing Conditions of COVID- 19 Cases and Deaths Chart, #11 Exhibit 10 - Older Adults, #12 Exhibit 11 - COVID-19 Hospitalization and Death by Age, #13 Exhibit 12 - Social Distancing, Quarantine, and Isolation, #14 Exhibit 13 - How to Protect Yourself & Others, #15 Exhibit 14 - COVID-19 in Correctional and Detention Facilities United States, February-April 2020, #16 Exhibit 15 - July 22, 2020 Edition of Interim Guidance on Management of Coronavirus Disease 2019 (COVID-19) in Correctional and Detention Facilities, #17 Exhibit 16 - March 30, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #18 Exhibit 17 - April 1, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #19 Exhibit 18 - April 6, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #20 Exhibit 19 - May 1, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #21 Exhibit 20 - May 31, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #22 Exhibit 21 - June 3, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #23 Exhibit 22 - June 7, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #24 Exhibit 23 - June 8, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #25 Exhibit 24 - June 9, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #26 Exhibit 25 - June 10, 2020 Screenshot of the Federal Bureau of Prisons COVID-19 website, #27 Exhibit 26 - April 3, 2020 Memorandum for Director of Bureau of Prisons, #28 Exhibit 27 - April 13, 2020 Memorandum for All Chief Executive Officers, #29 Exhibit 28 - Opinion and Order, United States v. Wesam El-Hanafi, No. 1:10-cr-00162-KMW, #30 Exhibit 29 - Declaration of Expert Chris Beyrer, #31 Civil Cover Sheet, #32 Proposed Summons, #33 Proposed Summons, #34 Proposed Summons, #35 Proposed Summons, #36 Proposed Summons, #37 Proposed Summons) (Wilkerson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey S. Wilkerson