This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:48:58 (UTC).

Halliday et al v. Banc of America Funding Corp. Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-5 U.S. Bank National Association et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Halliday filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Banc of America Funding Corp Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-5 U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Phillip J. Green. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beverly E. Halliday

Jenison, MI 49428

Michael R. Halliday

Jenison, MI 49428

Defendants

Banc of America Funding Corp. Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-5 U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee, Successor in Interest, to Wachovia Bank National Association as Trustee

Brian T. Moynihan

Nichols Erieca

Schneiderman & Sherman PC

Brian Moynihan

Unknown Parties

Banc of America Funding Corp. Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-5 U.S. Bank National Association

Erieca Nichols

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Amy Sabbota Gottlieb

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC (Troy)

2600 W. Big Beaver Rd., Ste. 300

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JUDGMENT dismissing case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: lack of subject matter jurisdiction ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from 20th Circuit Court of Ottawa County, of receipt of remanded claims (ems) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

5 #8

Exhibit G

5 #7

Exhibit F

5 #6

Exhibit E

5 #5

Exhibit D

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Index

#5

(#5) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Brian Moynihan; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Gottlieb, Amy) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#4

(#4) LETTER, certified copy of remand order (for state law claims only) and docket sheet sent to 20th Circuit Court of Ottawa County (ems) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER remanding Plaintiffs' state law claims to Ottawa County Circuit Court; Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint stating a FDCPA claim no later than 21 days from the date of this Order; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

6 #7

Attachment 7

6 #2

Attachment 2

6 #1

Attachment 1

#6

(#6) STATE COURT FILE received re 20th Circuit Court Case No. 2019-5682-CH (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7) (clw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Judgment #9 , Order Dismissing Case (no motion) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael R. Halliday, Beverly E. Halliday (ns) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JUDGMENT dismissing case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: lack of subject matter jurisdiction ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from 20th Circuit Court of Ottawa County, of receipt of remanded claims (ems) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Brian Moynihan; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G) (Gottlieb, Amy) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER, certified copy of remand order (for state law claims only) and docket sheet sent to 20th Circuit Court of Ottawa County (ems) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael R. Halliday, Beverly E. Halliday (ems) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER remanding Plaintiffs' state law claims to Ottawa County Circuit Court; Plaintiffs may file an Amended Complaint stating a FDCPA claim no later than 21 days from the date of this Order; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATE COURT FILE received re 20th Circuit Court Case No. 2019-5682-CH (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7) (clw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Michael R. Halliday, Beverly E. Halliday (ems) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Brian Moynihan in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4397675 (Gottlieb, Amy) Modified text on 3/27/2019 (jlg) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with Certificate of Service) from 20th Circuit Court case number 19-5682-CH filed by Brian Moynihan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gottlieb, Amy) Modified text on 3/27/2019 (jlg) Modified text on 3/27/2019 (ems). (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less