This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 16:09:54 (UTC).

Halley, et al v. Waitr Holdings, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 Halley filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Waitr Holdings, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01800

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heather Gongaware

Jualeia Halley

Sandy Jones

Tiffany Sonnier

Deshawn Williams

Geleesa Denton

Sydney Salvant

Derrick James

Robin Ferrier

Darian Osborne

Alicia Brossette

Brooke R. Daigle

Kalisha James

Justis W Nelsom

Alexandra Gonzales

Jacques Jackson

Samore Connor

Elizabeth Mingo

Defendants

Waitr Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Landcadia Holdings, Inc. and Waitr Incorporated

Waitr Holdings, Inc.

135 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip Bohrer

Attorney at Bohrer Law Firm

8712 Jefferson Highway, Suite B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

William Clifton Alexander

Attorney at Anderson2X, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Austin Winters Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Alexander, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Lauren E. Braddy

Attorney at Anderson Alexander, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Steven F. Griffith, Jr.

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Erin E. Pelleteri

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Laura E. Carlisle

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Emily Olivier Kesler

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

43 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

43 #2

Exhibit s Nos. 1-3

43 #1

Memorandum in Support

#43

42 #1

Exhibit Consent of Umeka Jackson

#42

41 #1

Exhibit Consent of Jessica Boeneke

#41

#40

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim

1 #3

Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Heather Gongaware by Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit s Nos. 1-3, #3 Notice of Submission)(Pelleteri, Erin) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Umeka Jackson)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Jessica Boeneke)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Dylan J. Masters)(Alexander, William) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kendra Howard)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/22/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Waitr Holdings, Inc. answer due 4/26/2019; Waitr Incorporated answer due 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/16/2019. (jeg) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE by Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-13 Consents)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (jeg). (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carlisle, Laura) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Notice (Other), #6 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other). **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section L Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate 2 Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents To Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Heather Gongaware, Jualeia Halley of Filing Consents to Join. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Waitr Holdings, Inc. served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. (Bohrer, Philip) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Only 1 Defendant should be named on each summons. Clerk has corrected summons and issued 1 for each defendant.** (mm) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Waitr Holdings, Inc., Waitr Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Waitr Holdings, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7452181) filed by Jualeia Halley, Heather Gongaware. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim, #4 Exhibit Consent to Join Wage Claim, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Heather Gongaware(pty:pla), Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Jualeia Halley(pty:pla).(Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mm). (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Waitr Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily Olivier Kesler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura E Carlisle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Franklin Griffith, Jr.