This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 09:05:05 (UTC).

Hall v. Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On June 23, 2021, Danielle Hall (“Plaintiff”), individually, as Next Friend for AMH-S, a minor child and as administrator of the Estate of Matthew Sopcic represented by Shawn Saeed Hashemi of Chalaki Law, Carrollton and Todd Clement of The Clement Law Firm filed a personal injury lawsuit against Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik, Informatik GMBH d/b/a Witron Logistik, Informatik GmbH Corp., FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH and Target Corporation (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for the alleged suffering and death of Matthew Sopcic due to strangulation. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “On August 4, 2019, Matthew Sopcic was working at the Target Distribution Center, 3255 Airport Road, Denton, Texas in the course and scope of his employment with Target, cleaning in and around a conveyor system, when a piece of his clothing believed to be his hoodie got caught in a conveyor driveshaft (hereinafter referred to as the “Conveyor Driveshaft) as photographed below causing him to be strangled and resulting in his death (hereinafter the “Strangulation”).”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The dangers associated with the unguarded Conveyor Driveshaft were foreseeable and known or would have been known by Witron Logistic and/or Witron Logistik and/or FAS and/or Target if reasonable skill and foresight were applied to the matter.”

 

It was further alleged by the Plaintiff that, “There were safer alternative designs of the Conveyor Driveshaft which would have prevented or significantly reduced the risk of Matthew Sopcic’s Strangulation without substantially impairing the Conveyor Driveshaft’s utility and the safer alternative designs were economically and technologically feasible at the time the product left the control of the manufacturer or seller by the application of existing or reasonably achievable scientific knowledge.”

 

It was also alleged by the Plaintiff that, “Defendants Witron Logistic and/or Witron Logistik and/or FAS failed to adequately warn Matthew Sopcic and other workers who could foreseeably come into the zone of danger presented by the Conveyor Driveshaft of the danger presented by the unguarded Conveyor Driveshaft which was the producing cause of the Strangulation and Plaintiff’s resulting damages.”

 

There are two claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The firm claim is that the Defendants Witron Logistic and/or Witron Logistik and/or FAS allegedly defectively designed the Conveyor Driveshaft so as to render it unreasonably dangerous. The second claim is that at the time of the strangulation, Target was allegedly a non-subscriber, meaning Target did not have worker’s compensation insurance applicable to the strangulation or the death of Matthew Sopcic.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court to enter an order enabling the Plaintiff to judgment against Defendants for actual damages, prejudgment and post-judgment interest, costs of court and for such other and further relief, general and special, to which Plaintiff is entitled to recover at law or in equity, and/or which the Court deems proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.





Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Hall

Defendants

FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH

Target Corporation

Witron Logistik + Informatik GmbH doing business as Witron Logistik + Informatik GmbH Corp.

Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Clement

Attorney at The Clement Law Firm

17855 Dallas Parkway, Suite 155

Dallas, TX 75287

Shawn Saeed Hashemi

Attorney at Chalaki Law - Carrollton

3234 Commander Dr., Suite 100

Carrollton, TX 75006

Defendant Attorneys

Kent D Williamson

Attorney at SettlePou - Dallas

3333 Lee Parkway, Eighth Floor

Dallas, TX 75219-5112

Mark Trammell Craig

Attorney at SettlePou - Dallas

3333 Lee Parkway, Eighth Floor

Dallas, TX 75219-5112

David Adair McFarland

Attorney at Thompson Coe

700 N Pearl St, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Stephen C Carter

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP - Dallas

700 North Pearl Street, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER - granting #20 Motion for an Order to Appoint Special Process Service. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/12/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Unopposed MOTION Order to Appoint Special Process Service Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for an Order to Appoint Special Process Service by Danielle Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clement, Todd) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2021) (baf, ). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by Danielle Hall Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Clement, Todd) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH (McFarland, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Target Corporation Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Williamson, Kent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Williamson, Kent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH served on Texas Secretary of State submitted by Danielle Hall. The Executed Summons should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Target Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8467506.), filed by Danielle Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clement, Todd) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

13 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER - granting #20 Motion for an Order to Appoint Special Process Service. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/12/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION Order to Appoint Special Process Service Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for an Order to Appoint Special Process Service by Danielle Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clement, Todd) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2021) (baf, ). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/9/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by Danielle Hall Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Clement, Todd) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH Certificate of Interested Parties (McFarland, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc., Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH (McFarland, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Target Corporation Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Williamson, Kent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Williamson, Kent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Target Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Williamson, Kent) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH served on Texas Secretary of State submitted by Danielle Hall. The Executed Summons should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, ) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH served on Texas Secretary of State on 06/24/2021, filed by Danielle Hall. (Clement, Todd) Modified on 7/1/2021 (rpc, ). (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Witron Logistik Informatik GmbH. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Target Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH (TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE). (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Witron Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to FAS Forderanlagen Systeme GmbH. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8467506.), filed by Danielle Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clement, Todd) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant