This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 04:49:24 (UTC).

Hall v. Vision Precision Holdings LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 Hall filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Vision Precision Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna J. Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01734

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna J. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Hall

Defendants

Daniel & Max LLC doing business as Stanton Optical, a foreign limited liability company

Vision Precision Holdings LLC doing business as Stanton Optical, a foreign limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie E. Baze

Defendant Attorneys

David G. Hosenpud

Hank Stebbins

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet and certified copy of Judgment (#8 ) to Multnomah County Circuit Court. (eo) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JUDGMENT OF REMAND. Signed on 12/5/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) Modified text (adding signature date and judge) on 12/6/2019 (pvh). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#7) Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. On November 12, 2019, the Court issued an Order [#6] to Show Cause in which it directed Defendants to show cause in writing no later than November 27, 2019, why the Court should not remand this matter for lack of jurisdiction. Defendants have not filed a response to the Courts Order and, therefore, have failed to show cause in writing why this matter should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court REMANDS this matter to Multnomah County Circuit Court for lack of jurisdiction. (bb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order to Show Cause. The Court DIRECTS Defendants to Show Cause in Writing no later than 11/27/2019 why this matter should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. (See 10 page Order.) Signed on 11/12/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC. (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/27/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/30/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/30/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement of Vision Precision Holdings, LLC. Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC. (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement of Daniel & Max LLC. Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC. (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV42087 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6062039 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Daniel & Max LLC, Vision Precision Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Stebbins, Hank) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less