This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:35:29 (UTC).

Hall v. USA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Hall filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia R Wyrick and J Ronnie Greer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00153

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Amber Lynn Hall

Alderson, WV 24910

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Donald W Taylor

Attorney at U S Department of Justice (USAO Greene)

220 West Depot Street, Suite 423

Greeneville, TN 37743

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. This matter is before the Court on the United States Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. 6]. The motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/18/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Taylor, Donald) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy. This matter is before the Court on Petitioner Amber Lynn Hall's Motion Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy [Doc. 2]. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of Ms. Hall's 2255 motion to her, along with a copy request notice for future reference. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2020. (Copy of Order, 2255 Motion and Copy Request Notice mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Petitioner Amber Lynn Hall's Motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Her Sentence [Doc. 1]. The United States is ORDERED to respond to the motion within thirty days of this Order's date. See Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings for the United States District Courts. Although a reply to the United States' response is unnecessary, if Ms. Hall wishes to file a reply, she SHALL do so within thirty days of the date of the filing of the United States response. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

2 #1

Other Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy by Amber Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

Other Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Amber Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. This matter is before the Court on the United States Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. 6]. The motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/18/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Taylor, Donald) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy. This matter is before the Court on Petitioner Amber Lynn Hall's Motion Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy [Doc. 2]. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of Ms. Hall's 2255 motion to her, along with a copy request notice for future reference. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2020. (Copy of Order, 2255 Motion and Copy Request Notice mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Petitioner Amber Lynn Hall's Motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Her Sentence [Doc. 1]. The United States is ORDERED to respond to the motion within thirty days of this Order's date. See Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings for the United States District Courts. Although a reply to the United States' response is unnecessary, if Ms. Hall wishes to file a reply, she SHALL do so within thirty days of the date of the filing of the United States response. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (CAT) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Amber Lynn Hall) (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION Requesting that the Court Make Applicable Copies of 2255 Motion and Provide Petitioner with a Stamped Filed Copy by Amber Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Amber Lynn Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less