This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 08:59:36 (UTC).

Hall v. The Kroger Co et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Hall filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yvonne Hall

Defendants

The Kroger Co.

Kroger Texas L.P.

The Kroger Co

Kroger Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chip Evans

Attorney at Evans & Herlihy Law Firm

4407 Bee Caves Road, Suite 611

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Christopher M Blanton

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by THE KROGER CO.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12522054) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by THE KROGER CO.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before 2/11/2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/14/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) on or before 1/31/2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigned's judge-specific requirements; and (2) on or before 2/18/2022, Defendants file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/14/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The Court thus ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice per Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/31/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#7

(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT: This Final Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. In accordance with the #6 Order dismissing this case. It is ORDERED that this civil action is DISMISSED without PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/31/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. Mon Jan 31 08:42:09 CST 2022 (crt) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT: This Final Judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. In accordance with the #6 Order dismissing this case. It is ORDERED that this civil action is DISMISSED without PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/31/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The Court thus ORDERS that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice per Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/31/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4, 5. Fri Jan 14 12:05:17 CST 2022 (crt) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) on or before 1/31/2022, Plaintiff file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the undersigned's judge-specific requirements; and (2) on or before 2/18/2022, Defendants file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/14/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order shall be filed on or before 2/11/2022. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/14/2022) (twd) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by THE KROGER CO.. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by THE KROGER CO.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12522054) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M Blanton(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer B Kyle Briscoe