This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 11:03:21 (UTC).

Hall v. Sticht

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Hall filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Sticht. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John L. Sinatra, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01403

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Quinntez J. Hall

Attica, NY 14011-0501

Respondent

Thomas Sticht

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Letter from Quinntez Hall, dated 10/22/2020, to Clerk of Court. (CGJ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quinntez J. Hall. (CGJ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Quinntez J. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CGJ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Quinntez Hall, dated 10/22/2020, to Clerk of Court. (CGJ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attachment added that was left out of original scan. (CGJ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 5.00, receipt number ROC012485 (TF) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketRemark: Petitioner has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quinntez J. Hall. (CGJ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Quinntez J. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CGJ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less