This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2023 at 06:52:36 (UTC).

Hall v. Singh et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Hall filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen Cardone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen Cardone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Wayne Hall

Defendants

Jagjit Singh

Herian Brothers Trucking

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ruben Ortiz

John Paul Valdez

Roger C. Davie

Defendant Attorney

Michael P. Sharp

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Sharp on behalf of Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#4

(#4) ATTACHMENT Index of Pleadings Filed in State Court to #1 Notice of Removal, by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#5

(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Gerald M. Johnson, III (ep1) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#7

(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Jack Slattery (ep1) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Valdez on behalf of Charles Wayne Hall. Attorney John Paul Valdez added to party Charles Wayne Hall(pty:pla) (Valdez, John) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger C. Davie on behalf of Charles Wayne Hall. Attorney Roger C. Davie added to party Charles Wayne Hall(pty:pla) (Davie, Roger) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/7/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2023, Discovery due by 8/7/2023, Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2023, Motions due by 9/7/2023,. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/26/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,, Status Conference set for 1/18/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 9/7/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2023, Discovery due by 8/7/2023, Joinder of Parties due by 6/2/2023, Motions due by 9/7/2023,. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint Report and Discovery Plan by Charles Wayne Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Davie, Roger) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger C. Davie on behalf of Charles Wayne Hall. Attorney Roger C. Davie added to party Charles Wayne Hall(pty:pla) (Davie, Roger) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Paul Valdez on behalf of Charles Wayne Hall. Attorney John Paul Valdez added to party Charles Wayne Hall(pty:pla) (Valdez, John) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Jack Slattery (ep1) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter as to Gerald M. Johnson, III (ep1) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (ep1) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ep1) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTACHMENT Index of Pleadings Filed in State Court to #1 Notice of Removal, by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Sharp on behalf of Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh (Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh (Filing fee $402 receipt number BTXWDC-16943081), filed by Herian Brothers Trucking, Jagjit Singh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sharp, Michael) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less