This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 09:35:26 (UTC).

Hall v. O'Brien et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Hall filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against O'Brien. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00580

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James William Hall

Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223

Defendants

Judge Tammy O'Brien

Magistrate Judge Tamara J. Todd

James R. Silver

Donald Gallick

State of Ohio Court of Claims

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Defibaugh

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

John C. Reece

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

Kirsten Leigh Smith

Attorney at City of Akron - Civil Division

161 South High Street

Akron, OH 44308

Edmond Z. Jaber

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin Ryder

34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

John T. McLandrich

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Solon, OH 44139

Andrew D. McCartney

Attorney at Office of the Ohio Attorney General

16Th Floor, 30 East Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Michael A. Walton

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Constitutional Offices

16Th Floor, 30 East Broad Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Reply to Defendant's Reply in support of Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim of Defendant filed by James R. Silver filed by James William Hall. Related document(s) #19 . (K,L) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#19

(#19) Reply in support of #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim of Defendant filed by James R. Silver. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#18

(#18) Reply in support of #9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by State of Ohio Court of Claims. (Walton, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#17

(#17) Amended Motion for judgment on the pleadings Amending the certificate of service to include regular U.S. mail to the pro se Plaintiff filed by Defendant Tamara J. Todd. Related document(s) #16 . (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#16

(#16) Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendant Tamara J. Todd. (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#15

(#15) Motion Not to Dismiss Defendants Ohio Court filed by Plaintiff James William Hall. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#14

(#14) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tamara J. Todd. (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#10

(#19) Reply in support of #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim of Defendant filed by James R. Silver. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#9

(#18) Reply in support of #9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by State of Ohio Court of Claims. (Walton, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon State of Ohio Court of Claims on 4/18/2022, filed on behalf of James William Hall. (K,L) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tamara J. Todd on 4/14/2022, unsigned, marked C-19 filed on behalf of James William Hall. (K,L) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#4

(#4) Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to James R. Silver. Signature and delivery date not included. (K,L) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tammy O'Brien on 4/14/2022, unsigned, marked C-19 filed on behalf of State of Ohio Court of Claims. (K,L) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Reply to Defendant's Reply in support of Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim of Defendant filed by James R. Silver filed by James William Hall. Related document(s) #19 . (K,L) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Reply in support of #10 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim of Defendant filed by James R. Silver. (Jaber, Edmond) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Reply in support of #9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by State of Ohio Court of Claims. (Walton, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Amended Motion for judgment on the pleadings Amending the certificate of service to include regular U.S. mail to the pro se Plaintiff filed by Defendant Tamara J. Todd. Related document(s) #16 . (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendant Tamara J. Todd. (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Motion Not to Dismiss Defendants Ohio Court filed by Plaintiff James William Hall. (M,TL) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tamara J. Todd. (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Attorney Appearance by Kirsten Leigh Smith filed by on behalf of Tamara J. Todd. (Smith, Kirsten) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #12 Return of Service Unexecuted mailed to James William Hall at State Route 8 P.O. Box 1123 Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44223 on 5/19/2022. (O,K) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Donald Gallick. Service attempted by certified on 4/14/2022, 4/19/2022 filed on behalf of James William Hall. Related document #2 . (O,K) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for extension of time until May 27, 2022 to answer filed by Defendant Tamara J. Todd. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Christopher Reece - Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Reece, John) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon State of Ohio Court of Claims on 4/18/2022, filed on behalf of James William Hall. (K,L) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tamara J. Todd on 4/14/2022, unsigned, marked C-19 filed on behalf of James William Hall. (K,L) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified mail receipt returned, addressed to James R. Silver. Signature and delivery date not included. (K,L) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tammy O'Brien on 4/14/2022, unsigned, marked C-19 filed on behalf of State of Ohio Court of Claims. (K,L) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Donald Gallick Receipt # 7021 0950 0002 1207 8215; Tammy O'Brien Receipt # 7021 0950 0002 1207 8222; James R. Silver Receipt # 7021 0950 0002 1207 8178; State of Ohio Court of Claims Receipt # 7021 0950 0002 1207 8192; Tamara J. Todd Receipt # 7021 0950 0002 12088 3301. All placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (O,K) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to plaintiff at the counter for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (O,K) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (O,K) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid of $402.00, Receipt # 54660008526. Filed by James William Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (O,K) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketJudge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (O,K) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edmond Z. Jaber

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Mccartney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Defibaugh