This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:17:29 (UTC).

Hall v. Marigold Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Hall filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Marigold Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08398

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrance Hall

Defendant

Marigold Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

4890 W. Kennedy Blvd., Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33609

Gary James Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

111 W. Jackson, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Rulon

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC

9277 Centre Pointe Drive, Suite 300

West Chester, OH 45069

Paul H Burmeister

Attorney at Davis & Campbell, L.L.C.

333 S. Wabash, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60604

Amy Wilson

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd

201 N. Illinois Street, Suite 1900

Indianapolis, IN 46244

David George Lubben

Attorney at Davis & Campbell, L.L.C.

401 Main Street, 1600

Peoria, IL 61611

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #12 ) is hereby granted. Attorney Amy Wilson is added as counsel for Marigold Inc. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16744145. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Dckt. No. #10 ) is granted. Attorney Jennifer Rulon is added as counsel for Marigold Inc. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16739492. (Rulon, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marigold Inc. (Lubben, David) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marigold Inc. by Paul H Burmeister (Burmeister, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marigold Inc. by David George Lubben (Lubben, David) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terrance Hall. Marigold Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Klepper, Gabrielle) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for March 9, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by March 5, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrance Hall by Gary James Martoccio (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Terrance Hall by Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper (Klepper, Gabrielle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Terrance Hall; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16560834. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klepper, Gabrielle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marigold Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A Rulon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David George Lubben