This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:24:38 (UTC).

Hall v. Jackson et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Hall against Jackson in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03191

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Joshua Hall

Defendants

Judge Maria T Jackson

Assistant DA of District 339th

Danny K. Easterling

Diana Olvera

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This case is dismissed with prejudice for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted. This dismissal shall act as a strike for the pruposes of Section 1915(g). A copy of this Order was mailed to the Harris County Jail Inmate Trust Fund. Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 10/20/2019)

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Mark Joshua Hall.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mark Joshua Hall, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#6

(#6) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on October 15, 2019(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 10/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on October 15, 2019(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 10/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This case is dismissed with prejudice for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted. This dismissal shall act as a strike for the pruposes of Section 1915(g). A copy of this Order was mailed to the Harris County Jail Inmate Trust Fund. Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 10/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark Joshua Hall, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mark Joshua Hall, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/13/2019. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Mark Joshua Hall.(LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.