This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 11:16:12 (UTC).

Hall v. Gannett Company Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 Hall filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Gannett Company Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina S. Edwards and Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00296

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grace Hall

Nicole Love

Darren Brasher

Defendant

Gannett Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Austin W. Anderson

Attorney at Anderson2X, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Stanley Lubin

Attorney at Lubin & Enoch, P.C.

349 N. Fourth Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85003

William C. Alexander

Attorney at Anderson2X, PLLC

819 N. Upper Broadway

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Corey R. Feltre

Attorney at Lubin & Enoch, P.C.

349 N. Fourth Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Nicholas Jason Enoch

Attorney at Lubin & Enoch, P.C.

349 N. Fourth Avenue

Phoenix, AZ 85003

Robert E. DeRose, II

Attorney at Barkan Meizlish DeRose Wentz McInerney Peifer, LLP

250 E. Broad Street, 10Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Trent R. Taylor

Attorney at Barkan Meizlish DeRose Wentz McInerney Peifer, LLP

250 E. Broad Street, 10Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Jessica R. Doogan

Attorney at Barkan Meizlish DeRose Wentz McInerney Peifer, LLP

250 E. Broad Street, 10Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Lylburn Scroggins

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Chicago

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Richard B. Lapp

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Chicago

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Camille A. Olson

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Chicago

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Linda C. Schoonmaker

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP - Houston

700 Milam, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

68 #1

Exhibit Consent of Nicole M. Hoier

#68

(#68) NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Grace Hall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Nicole M. Hoier) (Alexander, William) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#67

(#67) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 6/5/2019 granting #62 Motion for Attorney Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#66

(#66) ORDER (EBOC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2019. Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

65 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#65

(#65) NOTICE of Filing by Grace Hall re #64 Notice of Deficiency (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Trent) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Deficiency re #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: Certificate of Good Standing not filed with Court. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/18/2019. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

62 #1

Proposed Order

#62

(#62) MOTION for Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2874743. by Plaintiff Grace Hall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Trent) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Gannett Company Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) *Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16435045. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00339-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC) *Modified file date from 1/22/19 to 1/21/19; NEF regenerated on 1/24/2019 (SCH). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) *SUMMONS Submitted by Grace Hall. (Enoch, Nicholas)(BAC) *Modified file date from 1/22/19 to 1/21/19; NEF regenerated on 1/24/2019 (SCH). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C: Love Consent

1 #2

Exhibit B: Consent

1 #1

Exhibit A: Hall Consent

#1

(#1) *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16435045 filed by Grace Hall. (Enoch, Nicholas) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hall Consent, #2 Exhibit B: Consent, #3 Exhibit C: Love Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) *Modified file date from 1/22/19 to 1/21/19; NEF regenerated on 1/24/2019 (SCH). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Grace Hall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Nicole M. Hoier) (Alexander, William) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 6/5/2019 granting #62 Motion for Attorney Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) ORDER (EBOC) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards: Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2019. Telephone Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) NOTICE of Filing by Grace Hall re #64 Notice of Deficiency (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Trent) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) NOTICE of Deficiency re #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: Certificate of Good Standing not filed with Court. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/18/2019. (DJT) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 5/30/2019 granting #59 Motion for Attorney Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) MOTION for Jessica R. Doogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2874743. by Plaintiff Grace Hall (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Trent) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN by Grace Hall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Barbara Ehi-Welton, #2 Exhibit Consent of Shaquita Stark) (Alexander, William) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Gannett Company, Inc.. (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) MOTION for Linda C. Schoonmaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2873305. by Defendant Gannett Company, Inc. (Scroggins, Andrew) (Main Document 59 replaced on 5/29/2019) (DJT). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (DJT). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' Second Lodging of Opt-In Forms by Grace Hall, Darren Brasher, Nicole Love. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27 Consents to Join - Cornita Anderson, Ebony Barnes, Ashley Bohannon, Daarina Boyd, Shakela Brent, Twinisha Bridgewater, Endora Brown, Terri L. Burton, Tia Butler, Carrie Conaster, Erica Cooper, Monica Copeland, Kimberly Fisher, Melita J. Foren-Plaiss, Veronne A. Gibbs, Tamera Groves-Jordan, Victoria Harris, Brandie Herp, Nikkia Houston, Valerie Howard, Melanie Howie, Magnolia Jacobi, Ronnella Jacoway, Reginay Johnson, Essense Jones, Nakiya Kenemore, Adjelley Lassey, Victoria Lyons)(Anderson, Austin) *Modified to add filers on 4/4/2019 (DXD). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Austin Anderson and William Clifton Alexander on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Darren Brasher, Grace Hall, Nicole Love: Affidavit of Service re: Docs 1-5 upon Gannett Co. Inc. on 1/25/2019. (Enoch, Nicholas) [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' First Lodging of Opt-In Forms by Darren Brasher, Grace Hall, Nicole Love . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Opt-In Consent Forms)(Enoch, Nicholas) [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/22/2019. (LFIG) [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Gannett Company Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) *Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16435045. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00339-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC) *Modified file date from 1/22/19 to 1/21/19; NEF regenerated on 1/24/2019 (SCH). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *SUMMONS Submitted by Grace Hall. (Enoch, Nicholas)(BAC) *Modified file date from 1/22/19 to 1/21/19; NEF regenerated on 1/24/2019 (SCH). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16435045 filed by Grace Hall. (Enoch, Nicholas) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hall Consent, #2 Exhibit B: Consent, #3 Exhibit C: Love Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) *Modified file date from 1/22/19 to 1/21/19; NEF regenerated on 1/24/2019 (SCH). [Transferred from azd on 4/19/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.