This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:42:01 (UTC).

Hall v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Hall filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph M. Hood and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Hall

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark K. Gray

Attorney at Gray & White - Prospect

9301 Dayflower Street, Suite 300

Prospect, KY 40059

Jacob E. Levy

Attorney at Gray & White - Lou

713 E Market Street, Suite 200

Louisville, KY 40202

Matthew L. White

Attorney at Gray & White - Prospect

9301 Dayflower Street, Suite 300

Prospect, KY 40059

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP - Atlanta

201 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Melissa Foster Bird

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

949 Third Avenue, Suite 200

Huntington, WV 25719

Megan Basham Davis

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP - Huntington, WV

949 Third Avenue, Suite 200

Huntington, WV 25719

 

Court Documents

#23

22 #4

Exhibit D - CMO No. 12

22 #3

Exhibit C - CMO No. 17

22 #2

Exhibit B - CMO No. 7

22 #1

Exhibit A - 11/10/2015 Stipulated Protective Order

#22

#21

20 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#20

#19

#18

#15

12 #1

*Restricted*

#12

#7

#6

#3

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Discovery disputes REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins; 2) Court encourages early and economic case resolution; 3) Initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 6/4/2020; 4) Plaintiff produce updated, completed Fact Sheet and related information by 6/22/2020; 5) Defendants produce updated, completed Fact Sheet and related information by 7/22/2020; 6) All motions to amend pleadings and join additional parties shall be filed on or before 8/21/2020; 7) That all fact discovery must be completed on or before12/21/2020; 8) Plaintiff provide case-specific expert witness reports by 1/11/2021, Defendants shall provide case-specific expert witness reports on or before 2/10/2021, and Plaintiff shall provide case-specific rebuttal expert witness reports on or before 3/2/2021; 9) That Plaintiff's case-specific experts shall have their depositions taken on or before 4/1/2021, and Defendants' case-specific experts shall have their depositions taken on or before 4/21/2021; 10) Dispositive Motions filed on or before 5/21/2021; 11) All motions for extensions of time or to modify this scheduling order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition. The parties are advised in advance that such motions are disfavored; 12) Discovery governed by Fed.R.Civ.P. a-e; 13) Motion practice governed by Local Rule 7.1 except as provided in a-g; 14) That at least ten (10) days before the final pretrialconference, counsel shall: see order a-f; 15) Assigned for FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 8/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. The parties shall be prepared to discuss a settlement of the matter; 16) Assigned JURY TRIAL set for 8/31/2021 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood. The parties anticipate that trial will last at least three (3) weeks. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/22/2020.(MM)cc: COR, Lex D, Lex JC (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Joseph M. Hood for review: #22 Joint Status Report (MM) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11/10/2015 Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - CMO No. 7, #3 Exhibit C - CMO No. 17, #4 Exhibit D - CMO No. 12)(Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time tomeet and confer. The Court finding good cause shown, and being otherwise sufficiently advised,IT IS ORDERED that the Parties' deadline to meet and confer pursuant to Rule26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and to submit their Joint Status Report pursuant to the Court's March 30, 2020 Order (ECF Doc No. #18 ) be CONTINUED for 14 days after entry of this Order to allow the Parties additional time to meet and confer. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/1/2020.(MM)cc: COR (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated 14 days extension of Rule 26 meeting deadline (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bird, Melissa) Modified motion text on 5/1/2020 (RBB). (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated of Substitution of Counsel (Bird, Melissa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram no longer assigned to case per DE #18 Order. (MM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: On March 27, 2020, this civil action was transferred to thisCourt from the District of Arizona. [DE #12 ]. Accordingly, seeing as all parties have appeared in the action, IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of service of this Order, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, to make or arrange for the disclosures; (2) Within ten (10) days after the meeting the parties shall file a joint status report; (3) Each party is directed to advise the Court at the time ofthe submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated, to the extent the party has not already done so; and (4) Since this matter has been transferred from the Hon. Robert E. Wier to the undersigned, Judge Wier's Standing Case Management and Referral Order [DE #15 ] is VACATED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 03/30/2020.(MM)cc: COR (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: The Court, on its own motion and per communication between the involved Chambers, TRANSFERS this matter to United States Senior District Judge Joseph M. Hood for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 03/27/2020.(MM)cc: COR and Richard B. North, Jr. by US Mail (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) VACATED by DE #18 Order STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2019.(MM)cc: COR Modified text on 3/30/2020 (MM). (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX171554 as to Mark K Gray. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX171553 as to Matthew White. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mark Gray on behalf of Tiffany Hall. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew White on behalf of Tiffany Hall. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • DocketPRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170851 as to Jacob Levy. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Docket(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-1099-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jacob Hall on behalf of Tiffany Hall. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Tiffany Hall. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. NO FURTHER ACTION IS REQUIRED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX170858 filed by Tiffany Hall.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 3/27/2020.] (Entered: 04/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Edward Levy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark K. Gray