This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2021 at 09:11:03 (UTC).

Hall v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Hall filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81501

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Hall

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

900 Ridgebury Road

Ridgebury, CT 06877

Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH

Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline plc

Pfizer, Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

55 Corporate Drive

Bridgewater, NJ 08807-1265

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi SA

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Chattem, Inc.

Amerisource Bergen Corporation

Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging

2550 John Glenn Ave., Suite A

Columbus, OH 43217

Cardinal Health, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals, Corp.

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Calle Marie Mendenhall

Attorney at Farris Riley & Pitt

505 20Th St. N, Stuie 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81501-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCases associated Re: 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (pes) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14958222, filed by Michael Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mendenhall, Calle) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amerisource Health Services, LLC d/b/a American Health Packaging is a litigant

Latest cases where Geri-Care Pharmaceuticals Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amerisource Bergen Corporation is a litigant