This case was last updated from PACER on 01/22/2021 at 09:07:05 (UTC).

Hall v. Anacreon et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Hall filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Anacreon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-12094

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Hall

Defendants

Jean-Marie Anacreon

Rasier, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean C. Joanis

Attorney at Law Office of Richard G. Whalen

Suite 125, 475 Kilvert Street

Warwick, RI 02886

Defendant Attorneys

Eileen P. Kavanagh

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

6 Kimball Lane, Suite 100

Lynnfield, MA 01940

Christopher G. Betke

Attorney at Coughlin & Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Lesley P. Chuang

Attorney at COUGHLIN BETKE LLP

175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Judge Patti B. Saris: CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit A.

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Rasier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.)(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit A., State Court Record

#9

(#9) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rasier, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Rasier, LLC.. (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jean-Marie Anacreon.(Kavanagh, Eileen) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley P. Chuang on behalf of Rasier, LLC (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

1 #5

Category Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C, Written Consent

1 #2

Exhibit B, Pleadings served upon Rasier, LLC

1 #1

Exhibit A, Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rasier, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8522777 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Pleadings served upon Rasier, LLC, #3 Exhibit C, Written Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#14) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for JUNE 2021.(Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#13) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held on 1/19/2021 by Video. All deadlines Adopted in the Joint Statement -- EXCEPT for the Proposed Pretrial Conference date of July 22, 2022. See docket #10 for all deadlines. Parties agree to refer matter to ADR for June 2021. (Atty Kavanaugh, Betke, Joanis) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Judge Patti B. Saris: CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Rasier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.)(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 1/19/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rasier, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Rasier, LLC.. (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rasier, LLC.(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jean-Marie Anacreon.(Kavanagh, Eileen) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley P. Chuang on behalf of Rasier, LLC (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rasier, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8522777 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Pleadings served upon Rasier, LLC, #3 Exhibit C, Written Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant