This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 14:10:56 (UTC).

Hall of Fame Partners, L.P. v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Hall of Fame Partners, L P filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Affiliated FM Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Curtis L Collier and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00090

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Curtis L Collier

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hall of Fame Partners, L.P.

Defendants

Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Affiliated FM Insurance Company

Illinois Union Insurance Company

AXIS Surplus Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W Morris Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, PC

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37902

John M Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, PC

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37902

Defendant Attorneys

James R Embrey, Jr

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith PC (Nashville)

424 Church St., Ste 2950

Nashville, TN 37219

C Michael Johnson

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC (Atl)

191 Peachtree St, Ne, Suite 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Y Larry Cheng

Attorney at Hall, Booth, Smith PC (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2950

Nashville, TN 37219

Martha S Bradley

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

72 Patton Avenue

Asheville, NC 28801

Vic L McConnell

Attorney at Smith Cashion & Orr, PLC

231 Third Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37201

Jefferson C Orr

Attorney at Smith Cashion & Orr, PLC

231 Third Avenue North

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 2:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#24

(#24) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

22 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Jefferson C. Orr

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jefferson C. Orr ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4292253.) by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Jefferson C. Orr)(McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER: Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Co. answered the complaint on March 27, 2020. #19 The Courts Show Cause Order #18 is therefore DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/31/2020. (AWS) Mailed to C Michael Johnson. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

20 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent

#20

(#20) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on March 27, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent) (AYB) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Affiliated FM Insurance Company.(McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order: (1) Affiliated shall respond to the complaint; OR (2) Plaintiff shall move for entry of default against Affiliated pursuant to Rule 55(a); OR (3) Plaintiff shall show cause why Plaintiff's claims against Affiliated should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b). Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/26/2020. (AWS) Mailed to C Michael Johnson (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/2/20. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/2/20. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#2

(#9) SUPPLEMENT to #2 Certificate of Corporate Interest CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Embrey, James) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox, case number 2-16-20. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4251416), filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Embrey, James) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 2:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 4/3/2020. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court). (AGA) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding #22 MOTION for Jefferson C. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jefferson C. Orr ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4292253.) by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing for Jefferson C. Orr)(McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Co. answered the complaint on March 27, 2020. #19 The Courts Show Cause Order #18 is therefore DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/31/2020. (AWS) Mailed to C Michael Johnson. (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on March 27, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-consent) (AYB) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Affiliated FM Insurance Company.(McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order: (1) Affiliated shall respond to the complaint; OR (2) Plaintiff shall move for entry of default against Affiliated pursuant to Rule 55(a); OR (3) Plaintiff shall show cause why Plaintiff's claims against Affiliated should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b). Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/26/2020. (AWS) Mailed to C Michael Johnson (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Vic L McConnell on behalf of Affiliated FM Insurance Company (McConnell, Vic) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT to #2 Certificate of Corporate Interest CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Embrey, James) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to Complaint by AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Embrey, James) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: As the parties invoking the Court's subject matter jurisdiction, Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE within fourteen days of the entry of this Order why the Court should not remand thisaction to state court for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/4/2020. (AWS) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John M Kizer on behalf of Hall of Fame Partners, L.P. (Kizer, John) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/2/20. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/2/20. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/2/20. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Embrey, James) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox, case number 2-16-20. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4251416), filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, AXIS Surplus Insurance Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Embrey, James) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ILLINOIS UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant