This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2021 at 10:52:34 (UTC).

Hall et al v. Weber County et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Hall filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Weber County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00158

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nathan Hall

Hall, Matthew the Estate of

Defendants

Terry Thompson

Weber County

John Russell Wood

Mikel R. Kilfoyle

Wendy Jo Walkowiak

Nikki Leigh Nielsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily A. Swenson

Attorney at EMILY A. SWENSON PC

Po Box 9699

Ogden, UT 84409

Randall W Richards

Attorney at RICHARDS & BROWN PC

938 University Park Blvd Ste 140

Clearfield, UT 84015

Defendant Attorneys

Frank D. Mylar

Attorney at MYLAR LAW PC

2494 Bengal Blvd

Salt Lake City, UT 84121

Gregory M. Soderberg

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

420 E South Temple Ste 510

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Kurt M. Frankenburg

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

420 E South Temple Ste 510

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

29 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Planning Meeting Email

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Undertaking of Bond by Nathan Hall, Hall, Matthew the Estate of (Richards, Randall) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time: The parties shall have up to and including January 25, 2021 to submit their Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 1/14/21. (dla) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Extension of Time Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Nathan Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Planning Meeting Email) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Swenson, Emily) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by John Russell Wood.(Frankenburg, Kurt) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M. Frankenburg on behalf of John Russell Wood (Frankenburg, Kurt) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Soderberg on behalf of John Russell Wood (Soderberg, Gregory) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Nikki Leigh Nielsen, Terry Thompson, Wendy Jo Walkowiak, Weber County. Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Terry Thompson(pty:dft), Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Weber County(pty:dft)(Mylar, Frank) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Defendants Wendy Walkowiak's Nikki Nielsen's and Mikel Kilfoyle's Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants Wendy Walkowiak, Nikki Nielsen and Mikel Kilfoyle have until January 11, 2021 to file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/28/20. (dla) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nathan Hall re #16 Order to Propose Schedule, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email 12/21/2020)(Swenson, Emily) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Nikki Leigh Nielsen, Wendy Jo Walkowiak. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Mikel R. Kilfoyle(pty:dft), Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Nikki Leigh Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Frank D. Mylar added to party Wendy Jo Walkowiak(pty:dft)(Mylar, Frank) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Wendy Jo Walkowiak. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Russell Wood. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nikki Leigh Nielsen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Weber County. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Mikel R. Kilfoyle. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Wendy Jo Walkowiak. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Terry Thompson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (dw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed againg the plaintiff instead of the defendants. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected re #2 Complaint. (rks) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Nathan Hall Weber County, John Russell Wood, Mikel R. Kilfoyle, Terry Thompson, Wendy Jo Walkowiak (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3807327) filed by Nathan Hall. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Swenson, Emily) Modified by correcting that the complaint was filed against defendants on 11/24/2020 (rks). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiffs Nathan Hall and Hall, Matthew the Estate of are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weber County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall W Richards

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily A. Swenson