This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:30:50 (UTC).

Hall et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Hall filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Shirley Padmore Mensah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01094

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shirley Padmore Mensah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Twanda Hall

St. Louis, MO 63107

Khalia Hall

St. Louis, MO 63107

Y. H.

Defendants

United States of America

Jonathan Hopkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brent A. Sumner

Attorney at THE SUMNER LAW GROUP LLC

7777 Bonhomme Ave., Suite 2100

Clayton, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion for Appointment of Next Friend filed by Plaintiff Khalia Hall (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Khalia Hall is appointed as next friend of her minor child, Plaintiff Y.H.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/02/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL Summons by Plaintiffs Y. H., Khalia Hall, Twanda Hall. (Sumner, Brent) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to Y.H. ; relationship to minor:mother by Plaintiff Y. H.. (Sumner, Brent) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

1 #4

Summons Summons_USA

1 #3

Summons Summons_Hopkins

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8086496, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Twanda Hall, Y. H., Khalia Hall. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons_Hopkins, #4 Summons Summons_USA)(Sumner, Brent) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Twanda Hall, Khalia Hall as to Jonathan Hopkins. - THE DEFENDANT NO LONGER WORKS AT THE ADDRESS LISTED ON THE SUMMONS - (AAT) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion for Appointment of Next Friend filed by Plaintiff Khalia Hall (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Khalia Hall is appointed as next friend of her minor child, Plaintiff Y.H.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 10/02/2020. (AAT) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketJudge Mensah enters a Standing Order in all of her cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/shirley-padmore-mensah (AAT) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was emailed to Brent Sumner. (MFG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL Summons by Plaintiffs Y. H., Khalia Hall, Twanda Hall. (Sumner, Brent) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to Y.H. ; relationship to minor:mother by Plaintiff Y. H.. (Sumner, Brent) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-8086496, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Twanda Hall, Y. H., Khalia Hall. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons_Hopkins, #4 Summons Summons_USA)(Sumner, Brent) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less